May 4, 2012 |
Filing
137
ORDER granting Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. Plaintiff Gloria Rodgers may proceed on appeal without prepaying or giving security for fees and costs. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (MKR)
|
April 10, 2012 |
Filing
134
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Filing No. 96 ) is granted. Plaintiff Gloria Rodgers's Amended Complaint is dismissed, with prejudice. All other pending motions are denied as moot. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (TEL)
|
March 16, 2012 |
Filing
122
ORDER granting 117 the Joint Motion to Extend/Alter Deadlines. The deadlines are extended as requested and set out in this order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (ARL, )
|
March 7, 2012 |
Filing
114
ORDER - Defendants Motion in Limine to Exclude Testimony of Jerome Sherman(filing 89 ) is denied as moot. Defendants Motion for Fees and Costs Incurred in Preparing Motion in Limine (filing 102 ) is denied. Plaintiffs request for attorneys fees (filing 106 ) is denied. Defendants will not be awarded costs and attorneys fees in connection with their motion to compel (filing 65). However, by or before March 14, 2012, Plaintiff shall provide proper, written responses to Defendants Second Set of Interrogatories and Second Set of Requests for Production of Documents and produce the requested materials. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (MKR)
|
December 7, 2011 |
Filing
79
ORDER granting the Defendant's 65 Motion to Compel. Plaintiff shall produce the documents and information responsive to Defendants Second Set of Interrogatories and Second Set of Requests for Production of Documents on or before December 19 , 2011. On or before December 19, 2011, Plaintiff shall file a response to this Ordershowing cause why Defendants should not be awarded reasonable costs andattorneys fees incurred in bringing this motion to compel. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (MKR)
|
November 10, 2011 |
Filing
76
THIRD AMENDED ORDER SETTING FINAL SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF CASE, granting 75 the extensions requested in the Joint Motion to Extend. Pretrial Conference remains set for 4/16/2012 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. Jury Trial remains set for 5/15/2012 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Judge Laurie Smith Camp. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (ARL, )
|
October 24, 2011 |
Filing
64
PROTECTIVE ORDER -Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (MKR)
|
June 2, 2011 |
Filing
54
ORDER - A telephonic status conference will be held with the undersigned on Thursday, June 9, 2011 at 9:30 a.m. Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate the conference call to chambers. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (TCL )
|
March 25, 2011 |
Filing
38
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Defendants Motion to Dismiss (Filing No. 23 ) is granted in part. All claims except Plaintiffs ADEA claim against DTN only, Plaintiffs ERISA claim against DTN only, and state breach of contract claim against Defendants DTN, Wh ittinghill, and Washburn are dismissed; The claims against Defendant Telvent remain dismissed. In accordance with this Memorandum and Order, and the courts March 25, 2010, Memorandum and Order, the Clerk of the court is directed to terminate all Defe ndants except Data Transmission Network, Chris Whittinghill, and Sheri Washburn from this matter; The remaining Defendants shall file an answer to the remaining claims in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(a)(4); and A separate progression order will be entered progressing this matter to final disposition. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (MKR)
|
March 25, 2010 |
Filing
6
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - All claims against Defendant Telvent are dismissed without prejudice because Plaintiff has failed to state a claim upon which relief may be granted as to that Defendant. Plaintiff's claims against the remaining Defendants may proceed and service is now warranted. To obtain service of process on Defendants, Plaintiff must complete and return the summons forms which the Clerk of the court will provide. The Clerk of the court shall send FOUR (4) summons forms and FOUR (4), ***Pro Se Case Management Deadlines: Check for completion of service of summons. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party along with 4 summonses and 4 Marshal's 285 forms)(GJG)
|
February 19, 2010 |
Filing
5
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Filing No. 2 ) is provisionally granted, and the Complaint shall be filed without payment of fees.Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL )
|