Hollingsworth v. The Nebraska Food Bank Network, Inc.
Plaintiff: Michael Hollingsworth
Defendant: The Nebraska Food Bank Network, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2010cv00121
Filed: April 2, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Presiding Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 Job Discrimination (Race)
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER regarding Order Setting Schedule for Progression of a Pro Se Case, 29 . Plaintiff was advised that failure to respond by February 7, 2011, would result in claims against Defendant being dismissed without prejudice and without further notice. Because Plaintiff has failed to comply with the court's directive, IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Plaintiffs action is dismissed without prejudice. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (JAB)
November 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER - 1. Joy Shiffermiller's motion to withdraw (Filing No. 18 ) is granted. 2. Michael Hollingsworth is hereby considered proceeding pro se and counsel for the defendant may communicate with the plaintiff directly regarding this case. 3. The Clerk of Court shall reassign this case to the pro se docket in accordance with General Order No. 2007-13. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(JAB)
September 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER holding in abeyance 18 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Michael Hollingsworth shall have until October 29, 2010, to respond to the motion to withdraw. Moving counsel shall serve a copy of this order on her client and file a certificate of such service with the court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TRL)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hollingsworth v. The Nebraska Food Bank Network, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Hollingsworth
Represented By: Joy A. Shiffermiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Nebraska Food Bank Network, Inc.
Represented By: John C. Hewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?