September 20, 2010 |
Filing
62
SCHEDULING ORDER. Cross-motions for summary judgment shall be filed not later than December 17, 2010 in the lead case only (Aschenbrenner v. Dolgencorp, Inc., 8:10CV153). Responses to the motions for summary judgment shall be filed no later than January 7, 2011. (Case Management Deadline set for 12/17/2010.) Member Cases: 8:10-cv-00153-LSC-FG3 et al.Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (CLS, )
|
August 9, 2010 |
Filing
58
ORDER denying transfer from the Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. The motion, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1407(c), for transfer of these actions is denied. Member Cases: 8:10-cv-00153-LSC -FG3 et al. (JAE)
|
July 28, 2010 |
Filing
56
ORDER granting (54) and (55) Motions to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorneys Jere L. Beasley, W. Daniel Miles, III, J. Allen Schreiber, and P. Mark Petro are granted leave to withdraw as counsel for the plaintiffs. Member Cases: 8:10-cv-00153-LSC -FG3 et al.Ordered by Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett. (CLS, )
|
July 22, 2010 |
Filing
53
ORDER granting (52) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 8:10-cv-00153-LSC -FG3; granting (41) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 8:10-cv-00155-LSC -FG3; granting (40) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 8:10-cv-00156-LSC -FG3; granting (40) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 8:10-cv-00157-LSC -FG3; granting (39) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 8:10-cv-00158-LSC -FG3; granting (39) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 8:10-cv-00159-LSC -FG3; granting (40) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 8:10-cv-00160-LSC -FG3; granting (38) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 8:10-cv-00161-LSC -FG3; granting (39) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 8:10-cv-00162-LSC -FG3; granting (39) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in cas e 8:10-cv-00163-LSC -FG3. Attorney Ronald E. Manthey is granted leave to with draw as counsel for the defendant. The July 14, 2010 Order to Show Causeis satisfied as to Ronald E. Manthey. The Clerk shall terminate the appearance of Ronald E. Manthey as defense counsel. For purposes of this case, attorney Ronald E. Manthey is excused from registering to practice in the District of Nebraska and from registering for the court's CM/ECF System. Member Cases: 8:10-cv-00153-LSC -FG3 et al.Ordered by Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett. (JAB)
|
July 14, 2010 |
Filing
51
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - On or before July 30, 2010, attorneys Jere L. Beasley, P. Mark Petro, Roman A. Shaul, J. Trent Scofield, Joel S. Allen, Keith D. Frazier, Ronald E. Manthey, W. Daniel Miles, III and Elizabeth S. Washko shall register to practice in this district and register for the court's CM/ECF System or show cause by written affidavit why they cannot comply with the rules of the court. The Clerk shall mail a copy of this order to attorneys Jere L. Beasley, P. Mark Petro, Roman A. Shaul, J. Trent Scofield, Joel S. Allen, Keith D. Frazier, Ronald E. Manthey, W. Daniel Miles, III and Elizabeth S. Washko. Show Cause Deadline set for 7/30/2010. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett. (Copies mailed as directed)(AOA)
|
May 25, 2010 |
Filing
43
INITIAL PROGRESSION ORDER - The parties' stipulations regarding discovery and progression matters set forth in their proposed discovery schedule, not in conflict with the provisions of this order, are approved and adopted. Status Conference set for 9/20/2010 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett. Counsel for plaintiff(s) shall initiate the planning conference call to the court at 10:00 AM on 9/20/2010. Member Cases: 8:10-cv-00153-LSC-FG3 et al.Ordered by Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett. (CLS, )
|
May 12, 2010 |
Filing
34
CONSOLIDATION ORDER - Following a conference with counsel on May 12, 2010, the court finds that consolidation pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 42(a) is warranted. Cases Nos. 8:10CV153, 8:10CV155, 8:10CV156, 8:10CV157, 8:10CV158, 8:10CV159, 8:10CV160, 8:1 0CV161, 8:10CV162, and 8:10CV163 are hereby consolidated for all purposes, without prejudice to a party moving for severance for trial or disposition by summary judgment. Case No. 8:10CV153 is hereby designated as the "Lead Case." Cases Nos. 8:10CV155, 8:10CV156, 8:10CV157, 8:10CV158, 8:10CV159, 8:10CV160, 8:10CV161, 8:10CV162, and 8:10CV163 are hereby designated as the "Member Cases. Member Cases: 8:10-cv-00153-LSC-FG3 et al.Ordered by Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett. (JAB)
|