Bobenmoyer et al v. Woolam et al
Plaintiff: |
Gerald Bobenmoyer and Paul Koch |
Defendant: |
Silver Creek Express and Robert Woolam |
Case Number: |
8:2010cv00175 |
Filed: |
May 5, 2010 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nebraska |
Office: |
8 Omaha Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Joseph F. Bataillon |
Nature of Suit: |
Motor Vehicle |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Auto Negligence |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
April 20, 2011 |
Filing
45
ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL - Joint Stipulations of the parties 43 , 44 and the Court being fully advised in the premises, the Court hereby orders that all claims of Plaintiff Gerald Bobenmoyer are hereby dismissed with prejudice, eac h party to pay their own costs. All claims of Plaintiff Paul Koch are hereby dismissed without prejudice, each party to pay their own costs. The claims of Defendants, Robert Woolam and Silver Creek Express, Inc., as against Plaintiffs Gerald Bobenmoyer and Paul Koch are hereby dismissed without prejudice, each party to pay their own costs. rdered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (KBJ)
|
April 5, 2011 |
Filing
42
ORDER - On or before April 28, 2011, the parties shall electronically file a joint stipulation for dismissal (or other dispositive stipulation) and shall submit to Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon, at bataillon@ned.uscourts.gov, a draft order whi ch will fully dispose of the case. If the case is being dismissed, the stipulation shall state whether the dismissal is with or without prejudice. Absent compliance with this order, this case (including all counterclaims and the like) may be dismissed without further notice. The pretrial conference and trial previously scheduled are cancelled upon the representation that this case is settled or will be dismissed in this court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (KBJ)
|
July 20, 2010 |
Filing
18
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - On or before August 4, 2010, attorney Lance Carlson shall register for the System or show cause by written affidavit why he cannot comply with the rules of the court. Failure to comply with this order will result in Mr. Carlson being removed as counsel of record for the plaintiff. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (KBJ)
|
July 13, 2010 |
Filing
17
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULE FOR INITIAL PROGRESSION OF A CIVIL CASE - Counsel for plaintiff(s) shall initiate the planning conference call to the court at 10:00am on 11/16/2010. Counsel shall notify the undersigned magistrate judge by joint or separate letters by 10/14/2010 addressing mediation requirements. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (KBJ)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?