Carmichael v. J P Morgan Chase
Plaintiff: Clint Carmichael
Defendant: J P Morgan Chase
Case Number: 8:2010cv00212
Filed: June 1, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF A CASE (PRO SE) - All interrogatories, requests for admission and requests for production or inspection, whether or not they are intended to be used at trial, shall be served on or before November 29, 2010. The trial date will be set by Magistrate Judge Zwart at the time of the Final Pretrial Conference. Pretrial Conference set for 5/26/2011 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: Pretrial conference before Magistrate Judge Cheryl Zwart to be held on May 26, 2011. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (GJG) Modified on 11/1/2010 to remove text regarding copy mailed to pro se party (GJG).
June 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER of Recusal, Request for Reassignment. Upon review of the parties and the record in the above-designated case, the undersigned judge shall, and hereby does, recuse himself from the above-designated case pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 455(a). Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(JAB)
June 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 1 the Plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carmichael v. J P Morgan Chase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clint Carmichael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J P Morgan Chase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?