Smith v. Bakewell et al
Petitioner: |
Kevin G. Smith |
Respondent: |
Robert Bakewell and Robert Houston |
Interested Party: |
Nebraska Attorney General |
Case Number: |
8:2010cv00278 |
Filed: |
July 27, 2010 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nebraska |
Office: |
8 Omaha Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Pro Se Docket |
Presiding Judge: |
Richard G. Kopf |
Nature of Suit: |
Habeas Corpus (General) |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 13, 2011 |
Filing
18
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Petitioner has not requested, and the court declines to issue, a certificate of appealability. The Clerk of the court shall provide the Court of Appeals with a copy of this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed/e-mailed to pro se party and to the Court of Appeals)(GJG)
|
February 28, 2011 |
Filing
17
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Petitioner shall have until March 28, 2011, to file a motion for certificate of appealability and brief in support. In the event that Petitioner fails to file a motion and brief as set forth in this Memorandum and Order, the co urt will deny the issuance of a certificate of appealability without further notice. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case with the following text: March 28, 2011: check for COA and separate brief and deny if none filed. Petitioner's Motion to Appoint Counsel (filing no. 16 ) is denied. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (AOA)
|
December 22, 2010 |
Filing
15
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Petitioner shall have until January 21, 2011, to file a motion for certificate of appealability and brief in support. In the event that Petitioner fails to file a motion and brief as set forth in this Memorandum and Order, the court will deny the issuance of a certificate of appealability without further notice. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case with the following text: January 21, 2011: check for COA and separate brief and deny if none filed. Petitioner's Motion for Leave to Appeal IFP (filing no. 14 ) is denied as moot. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(AOA)
|
October 20, 2010 |
Filing
8
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (filing no. 1 ) is denied with prejudice. A separate judgment will be issued. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (AOA)
|
August 3, 2010 |
Filing
3
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that upon initial review of Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 1 as set forth in this memorandum and order are potentially cognizable in federal court; by 9/13/2010 respondent shall file a motion for summary judgment or state c ourt records in support of an answer; no discovery shall be undertaken without leave of the court as ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. ***Pro Se Case Management Deadlines: (Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 9/13/2010: deadline for Respondent to file state court records in support of answer or motion for summary judgment.) (Copies mailed as directed) (SED)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?