United States of America v. Flores-Parra et al
Plaintiff: |
United States of America |
Defendant: |
Eva L. Flores and Juan Jose Flores-Parra |
Case Number: |
8:2010cv00333 |
Filed: |
September 10, 2010 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nebraska |
Office: |
8 Omaha Office |
Nature of Suit: |
Real Property: Foreclosure |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1345 Foreclosure |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 20, 2012 |
Filing
49
JUDGMENT AND DECREE OF FORECLOSURE AND ORDER OF SALE in the amount of $39,931.40 plus accrued interest in the amount of $8,450.73 together with interest accruing at the rate of.18 percent computed daily and compounded annually until paid in full; setting priority of liens and directing sale of premises; granting plaintiff's motions for default judgment filings 22 and 47 . Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copies mailed to defendants)(GJG)
|
February 21, 2012 |
Filing
31
ORDER granting 30 Motion to Set Aside Marshal's Sale - The marshal's sale conducted on September 21, 2011, is hereby set aside. The United States District Court Clerk's Office is directed to return the $1,700.00 down payment to Jose G. Perez and Maria Bentura Perez. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copies mailed to Jose G. Perez and Maria Bentura Perez) (E-mailed to Financial) (TEL)
|
June 7, 2011 |
Filing
24
JUDGMENT AND DECREE OF FORECLOSURE AND ORDER OF SALE in the amount of $44,194.84, plus accrued interest at the legal rate of.18 percent computed daily and compounded annually until paid in full; setting priority of liens and directing sale of premises; granting plaintiff's motion for default judgment 22 against defendants Juan Jose Flores-Parra and Eva L. Flores. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (GJG) (Copies sent to defendants via U.S. Mail)
|
April 20, 2011 |
Filing
21
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER adopting Report and Recommendation that this bankruptcy and adversary proceeding be withdrawn to the U.S. District Court for the District of Nebraska 20 . Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (TEL)
|
December 9, 2010 |
Filing
19
ORDER - This case is referred to the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Nebraska; This case shall be terminated for statistical purposes by the Clerk of the Court for the District of Nebraska; and The Clerk of the Court for the District of Nebraska shall transmit the court file to the Clerk of the Bankruptcy Court for the District of Nebraska. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copies mailed to defendants) (KBJ)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?