John K. Cielinski v. Werner Enterprises, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: John K. Cielinski
Defendant: Does and Werner Enterprises, Inc.
916) 558-4839 (fax: Timothy B. Nelson
Case Number: 8:2010cv00351
Filed: September 20, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Presiding Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: Werner Enterprises, Inc. shall file its motion for summary judgment on or before July 15, 2011. The plaintiff shall have to on or before August 15, 2011, to file a response to any motion for summary judgment previously filed a nd to file his motion for summary judgment. Werner Enterprises, Inc. may file a reply in support of its own summary judgment motion and a response to the plaintiff's summary judgment motion on or before August 31, 2011. The plaintiff may file a reply in support of his own summary judgment motion on or before September 12, 2011. Within ten days following the court's ruling on the parties' cross motions for summary judgment, the plaintiff shall arrange a telephone conference with opposing counsel and the undersigned magistrate judge for the purpose of scheduling the matter to conclusion. Deadlines/Hearings terminated. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TEL)
March 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 79 PROTECTIVE ORDER granting 78 Joint Motion for Protective Order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (JAB)
December 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - 1. The defendant's motion to dismiss (Filing No. 16 ) is denied. 2. The plaintiff shall file a second amended complaint that conforms to the proposal outlined in the plaintiff's response (Filing No. 60), within 7 day s of the date of this order. 3. The defendant shall file its answer within 14 days thereafter. 4. Pursuant to the Order dated November 16, 2010 (Filing No. 59 ), the parties have thirty (30) days from the date of this order in which to file a planning report with the court under Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f). Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (JAB)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: John K. Cielinski v. Werner Enterprises, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John K. Cielinski
Represented By: Joshua H. Haffner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Werner Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Kurt A. Kappes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
916) 558-4839 (fax: Timothy B. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?