Bradley v. Urbom et al
Plaintiff: |
Juan Bradley |
Defendant: |
Joseph F. Bataillon, Richard Kopf, David L. Piester, Laurie Smith Camp and Warre K Urbom |
Case Number: |
8:2010cv00358 |
Filed: |
September 21, 2010 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nebraska |
Office: |
8 Omaha Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Pro Se Docket |
Presiding Judge: |
Lyle E. Strom |
Nature of Suit: |
Prisoner: Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
January 12, 2011 |
Filing
13
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff is not entitled to proceed IFP on appeal and the appeal is dismissed. The clerk of the court shall not process the appeal to the Eighth Circuit. The clerk of the court is directed to forward a copy of this memorandum and order to the parties and to the Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals. All pending motions are denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(JAE)
|
January 3, 2011 |
Filing
8
MEMORANDUM OPINION - Plaintiff has not shown that he faces any imminent danger of physical injury. In light of this, plaintiff is not entitled to proceed IFP, nor has he paid the full $350 filing fee. For these reasons, this matter will be dismissed. A separate order will be entered in accordance with this memorandum opinion. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(AOA)
|
November 8, 2010 |
Filing
6
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Filing No. 2 ) is denied. Plaintiff has until November 29, 2010, to either show cause why he is entitled to proceed IFP pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §1915(g) or pay the full $350.00 filing fee. In the absence of either action by plaintiff, this matter will be dismissed without further notice. The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this matter with the following text: November 29, 2010: Deadline for plaintiff to show cause or pay full filing fee. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(AOA)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?