United States of America v. Union Pacific Railroad Company

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Case Number: 8:2010cv00444
Filed: November 29, 2010
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Referring Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 8, 2011 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 70 Joint Stipulation for Partial Dismissal - Union Pacific's Administrative Procedure Act, Declaratory Judgment Act, and Constitutional Claims concerning the seizure of the railcars identified in the pleadings are dismissed with prejudice, reserving to Union Pacific the right to challenge future applications of the Tariff Act of 1930 on identical grounds in the event of future seizures. Counterclaim II asserted by the Government is dismissed with prejudice, with the unders tanding that by so dismissing, the Government does not concede that the District of Nebraska possesses jurisdiction over the seizures of the railcars at issue. In addition, the Government reserves the right to enforce future applications of the Tariff Act of 1930 against Union Pacific on identical grounds in the event of future seizures. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (MKR)
December 2, 2010 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - This matter is before the court on the court's Order regarding related cases 42 . Any party shall have to on or before December 10, 2010, to show cause why United States of America v. Union Pacific Railroad Company, 8:10CV444 should no t be consolidated with Union Pacific Railroad Company v. United States Department of Homeland Security, et al., 8:08CV336 and United States of America v. Union Pacific Railroad Company, 8:10CV430 for all purposes. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (KBJ)
November 30, 2010 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Before the court is a Notice of Related Case 3 filed on behalf of the plaintiff United States of America indicating that this case is related to six federal court cases filed in the District of Arizona, Southern District of California, and this district. The court notes that the Nebraska federal court case 8:08CV336 Union Pacific Railroad Company v. U.S.Department of Homeland Security has been consolidated with 8:10CV430 United States of America v. Union Pacific Railroad Company. The court finds this case, 8:10CV444, is related to consolidated cases 8:10CV430 and 8:08CV336. Further, the court refers the matter of whether this case should be consolidated with 8:10CV430 and 8:08CV336 to Magistrate Judge Thomas Thalken. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (KBJ)
November 29, 2010 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 7 Motion to Continuance and Motion to Extend Service Deadline. Therefore, the Court hereby GRANTS the "United States of America's Second Motion to Continue Initial Pretrial Conference and Motion to Extend Service of Comopl aint Deadline Under Rule 4(m) of the FRCP". The Initial Pretrial Conference herein is hereby CONTINUED and a new Order setting a new date for this Initial Pretrial Conference will issue shortly. Plaintiff will be allowed an additional sixty days to perfect service in this matter. (Signed by Judge Andrew S. Hanen) Parties notified. (TCL )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Represented By: Marjory Colvin Batsell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Nancy Lynn Masso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?