v. Bejvancesky et al
Defendant: Ambassador Holding Company and Lori Bejvancesky
Case Number: 8:2010cv03083
Filed: May 7, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Fair Labor Standards
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 78 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's motion to withdraw, (filing no. 77 ), is granted. The joint motion and stipulation for dismissal, (filing no. 76 ), is withdrawn. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (GJG)
June 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER - Within thirty (30) calendar days of the date of this order, the parties shall file a joint stipulation for dismissal (or other dispositive stipulation) with the clerk of the court (and provide a copy to the undersigned magistrate to whom this case is assigned), together with submitting a draft order which will fully dispose of the case. Absent compliance with this order, this case (including all counterclaims and the like) may be dismissed without further notice. This case is removed from the courts August 29, 2011 trial docket upon representation by the parties that the case has settled. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (AOA)
May 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 67 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge - upon consent of parties, this case is transferred to Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart for final disposition. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (TEL)
April 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting 63 Joint Oral Motion. Pretrial Conference set for 8/22/2011 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (CRZ)
March 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER denying as moot 53 Motion to Quash; granting 56 Motion to Withdraw Document Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (CRZ, )
February 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting 45 Motion to Continue. Jury Trial set for 8/29/2011 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, Federal Building, 100 Centennial Mall North, Lincoln, NE before Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (DMS)
February 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER denying 38 Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Remand. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (EJL)
June 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for trial in Lincoln, Nebraska 7 is granted. The Clerk of Court shall amend the docket in this matter to reflect the place of trial is Lincoln, Nebraska. Clerk to reassign case to Lincoln. Plaintiff's MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED MOTION AND AMENDED BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S DESIGNATION OF TRIAL IN LINCOLN, NEBRASKA 12 is denied as moot. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett. (JAB)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: v. Bejvancesky et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ambassador Holding Company
Represented By: Ross M. Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Bejvancesky
Represented By: Kathleen M. Neary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?