March 10, 2014 |
Filing
338
ORDER - The clerk of the Court will strike the Judgment (Filing No. 325 ). Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (GJG)
|
December 20, 2013 |
Filing
301
ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Attendance at Trial or Alternatively to Present Testimony by Contemporaneous Transmission (filing 283 ) is denied. Edward Samuel Edlings Motion to Quash (filing 294 ) is granted. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (GJG)
|
December 13, 2013 |
Filing
299
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the Motion in Limine to Ascertain the Admissibility of Evidence 241 submitted by Defendant Beemac Trucking, LLC, is denied; the Motion in Limine 264 submitted by Defendants Landstar Ranger, Inc., and Edward Samuel Edl ing is denied; Union Pacific's Objection to Magistrate Judge's Order 281 is overruled; and Magistrate Judge Gossett's Order (Filing N. 275) denying Union Pacific's Motion to Supplement the Final Pretrial Order is affirmed. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (ADB)
|
November 18, 2013 |
Filing
275
ORDER denying 269 Motion to Supplement Final Pretrial Order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (JSF)
|
November 5, 2013 |
Filing
254
ORDER overruling 252 Union Pacific Railroad Companys Objection. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (JSF)
|
October 31, 2013 |
Filing
239
ORDER RE: TRIAL PREPARATION (CIVIL JURY TRIAL). Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (JB)
|
April 30, 2013 |
Filing
226
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the Motion in Limine to Exclude Expert Testimony 156 and the Daubert Motion to Exclude Expert Opinions and Testimony 159 are granted. The Motion in Limine 203 filed by Plaintiff Union Pacific Railroad Company is gr anted in part, as follows: Paragraphs 2, 6, and 7 are granted; Paragraph 3 is granted to the extent it relates to the "BCO Resource Guide"; The Motion is otherwise denied. The Motion in Limine 206 filed by Defendant Beemac Trucking, LLC, is granted in part, as follows: Paragraphs 1, 2, 3, 5, and 6 are granted; and the Motion is otherwise denied. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (ADB)
|
April 23, 2013 |
Filing
224
ORDER RE: TRIAL PREPARATION (CIVIL JURY TRIAL). Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (JB)
|
March 11, 2013 |
Filing
200
ORDER granting 197 Motion for Leave to File Amended Exhibit List. Plaintiff shall file an amended exhibit list by or before 3/12/13. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (JSF)
|
March 7, 2013 |
Filing
196
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part 149 Motion for Summary Judgment - Plaintiff Union Pacific provided to the Defendants sufficient notice of its Carmack Amendment claim; Plaintiff Union Pacific Railroad Company's motion is otherwise de nied. The 144 Motion for Summary Judgment and 147 Motion for Summary Judgment are granted in part, as follows: a) The following state law claims, asserted by Plaintiff Union Pacific Railroad Company against the Defendants, are dismissed wit h prejudice: i. "NEGLIGENCE AS TO ALL DEFENDANTS", Filing No. 1 20-24; ii. "CONTRACTUAL INDEMNITY AS TO DEFENDANT BEEMAC", id. at 25- 29; iii. "COMMON LAW INDEMNITY AS TO ALL DEFENDANTS", id. at 30-34; iv. "BREA CH OF CONTRACT AS TO BEEMAC", id. at 35-38; b) Plaintiff Union Pacific Railroad Company's claim for attorney fees is dismissed with prejudice; and The Defendants' motions are otherwise denied. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (ADB)
|
November 28, 2012 |
Filing
134
ORDER granting in part 96 Motion to Compel. By or before December 5, Plaintiff shall produce the documents identified as item Nos. 6, 7, 8, 15, 19, 20, 22, 23, 35, 36, 39, 40 and 93 on its privilege log. Landstar's motion is denied in all other respects. Beemac's 99 Motion to Compel is granted. Plaintiff shall produce the complete, unredacted file of Billy Barefield by or before December 5, 2012. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (ADB)
|
November 14, 2012 |
Filing
129
ORDER regarding 96 Motion to Compel and 99 Motion to Compel. The Court believes that an in camera inspection of the documents at issue is warranted. By or before November 19, 2012, Plaintiff shall produce to the Court, for in camera review, the following numbered items identified on Plaintiff's privilege log: 6, 7, 8, 15, 19, 20, 22, 23, 27, 28, 32, 35, 36, 39, 40, 43, 46, 49, 56, 58, 60, 62, 64, 65, 66, 71, 72, 74, 78, 79, 81, 82, 84, 85 and 93. By said date, Plaintiff shall also provide the Court with unmarked copies of the documents from Barefield's investigative file which were redacted prior to production to Defendants. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (ADB)
|
September 25, 2012 |
Filing
122
SECOND AMENDED ORDER SETTING FINAL SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF CASE, granting 121 Joint Motion to Extend. Pretrial Conference set for 4/26/2013 at 09:30 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. Jury Trial set for 5/21/2013 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (ARL, )
|
February 16, 2012 |
Filing
77
AMENDED ORDER SETTING FINAL SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF CASE, granting 75 Motion to Extend. Pretrial Conference set for 12/17/2012 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. Jury Trial set for 1/15/2013 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (ARL, )
|
September 28, 2011 |
Filing
41
ORDER - The parties' Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Amendments to Pleadings and to Add Parties (filing 40 ) is granted. Any motion by Defendants to amend pleadings and/or add parties shall be filed not later than October 26, 2011. The planning conference scheduled for October 6, 2011, is hereby continued. A planning conference with the undersigned magistrate judge will be held on November 17, 2011, at 9:30 a.m. (CST) for the purpose of reviewing the preparation of the case t o date and the scheduling of the case to trial. Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate the call to the court. (Planning Conference set for 11/17/2011 at 09:30 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett.) Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (TEL)
|