United States of America v. $45,000.00 in United States Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $45,000.00 in United States Currency
Claimant: Carlos Martins
Case Number: 8:2011cv00014
Filed: January 19, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Presiding Judge: F.A. Gossett
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 28:1345 Complaint for Forfeiture
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 85 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the 82 Motion for Attorney Fees Fees and Litigation Costs filed by Claimant Carlos Martins, is granted; Claimant Carlos Martins is awarded attorney's fees as the prevailing party in the amount of $36,175.00; and Claimant Carlos Martins is awarded $262.80 for costs associated with this case. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (ADB)
July 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting 80 Motion to Return Defendant Currency. The U.S. Marshals Service is directed to return the Defendant currency, together with interest thereon from August 2, 2010, to the date the payment is tendered, to Carlos Martins by delivering same to the trust account of his attorney of record, Joseph Howard. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (1 Certified copy to USM) (KMG)
December 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 63 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW that the 61 Motion for Reconsideration is denied; The Defendant property is forfeited to the Plaintiff, the United States of America; and A separate Judgment will be entered. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (ADB)
November 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER that this matter is before the Court on the renewed motion to suppress raised orally on November 16, 2012, by the Claimant, Carlos Martins. The Court has carefully considered the record with respect to the initial motion to suppress. IT IS ORDERED that the Claimant's oral renewed motion to suppress is denied. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (ADB)
August 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER RE: TRIAL PREPARATION (CIVIL NON-JURY TRIAL). Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (JB)
February 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER adopting 40 the Magistrate Judge's Findings and Recommendation in its entirety; overruling 44 the Claimant's objections to the Findings and Recommendation; and denying 26 the Claimant's motion to suppress. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (JB)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $45,000.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Nancy A. Svoboda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $45,000.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Carlos Martins
Represented By: Joseph L. Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?