Cornhusker Energy Lexington, LLC v. English Boiler & Tube, Inc.
Plaintiff: Cornhusker Energy Lexington, LLC
Defendant: English Boiler & Tube, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2011cv00092
Filed: March 14, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Lyle E. Strom
Presiding Judge: F.A. Gossett
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: The joint stipulation for dismissal with prejudice is approved and adopted. All claims between the parties are dismissed with prejudice. Any pending motions are denied as moot. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TCL )
August 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER - All pending deadlines are stayed. The parties shall file a status report or dismissal papers on or before September 28, 2012. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TEL)
August 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER granting 80 Motion to Restrict pursuant to the E-Government Act - Restricted Exhibits filed in support of English Boiler's motion in limine shall remain as restricted access pending further order of the Court. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TEL)
August 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting 74 Motion to Restrict pursuant to the E-Government Act - Exhibit B filed in support of English Boiler's motion to exclude documents improperly disclosed shall remain as restricted access pending further order of the Court. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TEL)
August 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting 66 Motion to Restrict pursuant to the E-Government Act - Exhibits J, K, L, S, X, Y, Z and AA filed in support of English Boilers motion for partial summary judgment shall remain as restricted access pending further order of the Court. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TEL)
July 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting 53 Motion to Restrict - Exhibits C, D, E, F, H, I, J, and K shall remain as restricted access pending further order of the Court. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TEL)
June 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 47 FIFTH AMENDED FINAL PROGRESSION ORDER granting 45 Joint Stipulation to Modify Progression Order. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/6/2012 at 10:30 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. Jury Trial set for 9/25/2012 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TCL )
March 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 39 FOURTH AMENDED FINAL PROGRESSION ORDER granting 38 Joint Stipulation to Amend Progression Order. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/6/2012 at 10:30 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. Jury Trial set for 9/25/2012 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TCL )
December 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER denying as moot 29 motion to compel. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (JDR)
October 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 SECOND AMENDED FINAL PROGRESSION ORDER granting 27 Joint Stipulation to Modify Progression Order. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/9/2012 at 09:30 AM in Chambers before Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. Jury Trial set for 4/24/2012 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TCL )
September 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 AMENDED FINAL PROGRESSION ORDER granting 25 Joint Motion/Stipulation to Continue Progression Order Dates and Trial. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/9/2012 at 09:30 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. Jury Trial set for 4/24/2012 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TCL, )
May 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER regarding filing 18 Joint MOTION for Protective Order Relating To Discovery filed by English Boiler & Tube, Inc. Upon entry, the Clerk is directed to send certified copies of this Order to all counsel of record. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (GJG)(Certified copies sent as directed)
April 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 AMENDED ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 5/9/2011 08:15 AM in Chambers before Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TCL )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cornhusker Energy Lexington, LLC v. English Boiler & Tube, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: English Boiler & Tube, Inc.
Represented By: Michael T. Hilgers
Represented By: Christopher M. Malone
Represented By: Neil S. Talegaonkar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cornhusker Energy Lexington, LLC
Represented By: Patrice D. Ott
Represented By: John M. Lingelbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?