July 19, 2016 |
Filing
180
ORDER - The clerk of court shall disburse the sum of $1.10 to Tyrone Patterson by mailing the check to: Sheri Long Cotton, 1447 Panola Road. Ellenwood Village, GA 30294. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (GJG)(Copy to Finance)
|
June 24, 2015 |
Filing
179
ORDER granting 178 Motion for authority to pay the judgment into the Court is granted. Defendants may deposit the sum of $1.10 in the Registry of the Court. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy to Financial) (JSF)
|
October 7, 2013 |
Filing
166
ORDER granting 165 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. Plaintiff may proceed on appeal without prepayment of costs. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (JSF)
|
September 4, 2013 |
Filing
164
ORDER AND JUDGMENT that Plaintiff's request for a hearing on the motion is denied. Plaintiff's 161 Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's summary judgment order is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (ADB)
|
July 11, 2013 |
Filing
159
MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding: MOTION for Summary Judgment on the policy claims 152 filed by Molly Hiatt, Paul Hasiak, City of Omaha. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (ADB)
|
June 20, 2013 |
Filing
156
ORDER granting 155 Motion to Extend. Plaintiff shall have until June 27, 2013 to file a brief in opposition to defendants' motion to dismiss official capacity and policy claims. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (KMG)
|
May 7, 2013 |
Filing
151
ORDER granting 150 Motion for Leave. Defendants shall have until May 20, 2013, to file their motion for summary judgment on the Monell claims. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (ADB)
|
April 15, 2013 |
Filing
148
MEMORANDUM OPINION denying the motion of defendants to dismiss the remaining claims against Officer Hiatt, Officer Hasiak and the City of Omaha 133 . Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (JSF)
|
April 10, 2013 |
Filing
147
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 140 Motion to Set Aside Judgment. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (ADB)
|
March 26, 2013 |
Filing
139
ORDER granting 138 Motion to Seal. Exhibit 1 shall remain sealed pending further order of the Court. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (ADB)
|
March 4, 2013 |
Filing
136
ORDER granting 135 Motion to Extend Time within which to file a brief in opposition to defendants' motion to dismiss. Plaintiff shall have until March 8, 2013, to file a brief in opposition to defendants' motion. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (JSF)
|
February 14, 2013 |
Filing
132
ORDER on the telephonic conference with counsel. Pursuant to the agreement of the parties, Defendant City of Omaha shall have until February 22, 2013, to file a motion to dismiss. Plaintiff shall have until March 1, 2013, to file a response to said motion. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (MKR)
|
February 13, 2013 |
Filing
131
ORDER AND JUDGMENT that defendants Molly Hiatt's and Paul Hasiak's 106 Motion for New Trial is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (ADB)
|
February 6, 2013 |
Filing
125
ORDER granting 124 Motion to Extend. Plaintiff shall have until February 11, 2013, to respond to defendants' motion in opposition to plaintiff's 103 Motion for New Trial. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (ADB)
|
January 30, 2013 |
Filing
123
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 119 Motion for Reconsideration; denying as moot 105 Motion to Amend; Plaintiff's motion to place Exhibit 3 (Filing No. 119-4) under seal is granted; Plaintiff's motion to strike or seal defendant's exhibit containing the statements of the jury is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (ADB)
|
January 28, 2013 |
Filing
116
MEMORANDUM OPINION on the Plaintiff's Motion for attorney's fess and costs 101 . No attorney's fees or costs are appropriate. A separate order will be entered in accordance with this memorandum opinion. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (MKR)
|
January 24, 2013 |
Filing
115
ORDER granting 114 Motion to Extend. The defendants shall have until January 29, 2013 to respond to plaintiff's MOTION for New Trial 103 . Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (ADB)
|
January 15, 2013 |
Filing
112
ORDER granting 111 Motion to Extend. Defendants shall have until January 18, 2013, to respond to plaintiff's 101 Motion for Attorney Fees. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (ADB)
|
August 14, 2012 |
Filing
65
ORDER- Plaintiffs motion 62 is granted;Defendants objection 63 is overruled; the amended final progressionorder (Filing No. 31 ) is modified as set forth within the order. The final pretrial conference is set for: Monday, December 3, 2012, at 9:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett, Suite 2210, Roman L. Hruska United States Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, Nebraska; and Trial is set to commence before the undersigned at: Tuesday, December 11, 2012, at 9 a.m. Courtroom No. 5, Roman L. Hruska United States Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, Nebraska. ( Jury Trial set for 12/11/2012 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom., Pretrial Conference set for 12/3/2012 at 09:30 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett.) Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (MKR)
|
July 6, 2012 |
Filing
60
ORDER regarding 58 Motion to Continue. The pretrial conference date and trial date are cancelled. Plaintiff's counsel shall file a written report on or before August 6, 2012, advising the Court of the status of her representation of plaintiff, as well as when she will be ready for the pretrial conference and trial. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (ADB)
|
April 24, 2012 |
Filing
54
ORDER granting the motion of D.C. Bradford and Justin D. Eichmann's 48 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Plaintiff shall have until June 1, 2012, to advise the Court in writing whether he has obtained new counsel or will appear pro se. The [ 50] Motion to Continue trial is granted. ( Jury Trial rescheduled for 7/24/2012 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. Pretrial Conference set for 7/9/2012 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett.) Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
|
April 11, 2012 |
Filing
46
ORDER granting 44 Motion for Leave. Ellis D. McCarthur, Data No. 2246409, shall be made available for a deposition at the Douglas County Correctional Center, 710 South 17th Street, Omaha, Nebraska, on a date and time agreed to between counsel for the parties and the Douglas County Department of Corrections. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (ADB)
|
March 9, 2012 |
Filing
31
AMENDED FINAL PROGRESSION ORDER granting 26 Motion to Extend. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/23/2012 at 02:30 PM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. Jury Trial set for 5/1/2012 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TCL )
|
February 15, 2012 |
Filing
29
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE that defendants shall show cause, in writing, on or before March 1, 2012, why judgment of liability should not be entered against them. Failure to do so will result in a trial on the amount of damages only. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (ADB)
|
February 2, 2012 |
Filing
28
ORDER that defendants shall, on or before February 10, 2012, file a response to plaintiff's MOTION to Extend Progression Order Deadlines 26 explaining why they have not responded to plaintiffs requestsfor discovery. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (ADB)
|
July 7, 2011 |
Filing
13
ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 7/27/2011 08:15 AM in Chambers before Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TCL )
|