September 23, 2014 |
Filing
118
AMENDED ORDER granting the Joint 117 Motion to Amend Order. The Findings and Recommendation 115 are adopted in their entirety. The Unopposed Motion for Conditional Class Certification, Appointment of Class Representative, Appointment of Class Counsel, Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement And Notice to Class And Setting Of Final Approval Hearing (Filing No. 112 ), is granted, as set forth within the order. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (MKR)
|
September 15, 2014 |
Filing
116
ORDER adopting the 115 Findings and Recommendation in their entirety. granting 112 Motion to Certify Class; The Unopposed Motion for Conditional Class Certification, Appointment of Class Representative, Appointment of Class Counsel, Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement And Notice to Class And Setting Of Final Approval Hearing (Filing No. 112 ), is granted, as set forth within the order. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (MKR)
|
May 12, 2014 |
Filing
109
ORDER upon notice of settlement given to the magistrate judge. On or before June 11, 2014, the parties shall electronically file a joint stipulation for dismissal and shall submit to Chief District Judge Laurie Smith Camp, a draft order which will f ully dispose of the case. Absent compliance with this order, this case may be dismissed without further notice; and any pending deadlines are cancelled upon the representation that this case is settled. ***Set All Deadlines: ( Dismissal Papers Deadline due by 6/11/2014.) Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (MKR)
|
February 24, 2014 |
Filing
105
ORDER granting 104 Brian Christensen's Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. The Clerk of Court shall terminate Mr. Christensens appearance as counsel for Plaintiff and shall terminate future notices to him in this matter. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (MKR)
|
October 16, 2013 |
Filing
97
ORDER adopting the 96 Findings and Recommendation; and the Order of Reference 95 to the U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the District of Nebraska is withdrawn; and this case shall progress in this Court. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (MKR)
|
October 19, 2012 |
Filing
95
ORDER -This case is referred to the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Nebraska; All motions pending as of this date are denied without prejudice to refiling; This case shall be terminated for statistical purposes by the Clerk of the Court for the District of Nebraska; and The Clerk of the Court for the District of Nebraska shall transmit the court file to the Clerk of the Bankruptcy Court for the District of Nebraska. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (MKR)
|
October 16, 2012 |
Filing
91
AMENDED ORDER SETTING FINAL SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF CASE, granting 90 Joint Motion to Extend. Deposition deadline, 3/15/2013. Pretrial Conference set for 8/12/2013 at 09:30 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. Jury Trial set for 9/17/2013 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (ARL, )
|
April 13, 2012 |
Filing
72
ORDER denying 65 the Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by the Defendant, Backyard Burgers, Inc. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (JB)
|
February 15, 2012 |
Filing
52
ORDER granting 51 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Shawn M. Ford is allowed to withdraw as counsel for Plaintiff. The law firm of Spencer Fane Britt & Browne LLP, including Joshua C. Dickinson, Brian J. Christensen, Bryant T. Lamer and Lindsay T odd Perkins, will continue to represent Plaintiff in this matter. The Clerk of Court shall terminate the appearance of Shawn M. Ford as Plaintiff's counsel and, additionally, terminate future electronic notices to Mr. Ford in this matter. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (GJG)
|
October 13, 2011 |
Filing
35
PROTECTIVE ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the parties, their attorneys and Authorized Persons described in the Stipulated Confidentiality Agreement comply with the terms of the Agreement in its entirety. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (MKR)
|
September 14, 2011 |
Filing
25
ORDER - The Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record for Back Yard Burgers of Nebraska, Inc. 24 is granted. Dan Ketcham and the law firm of Engles, Ketcham, Olson & Keith, P.C. are hereby granted leave to withdraw as counsel of record for Back Yard Burgers of Nebraska, Inc.. Back Yard Burgers of Nebraska, Inc. will continue to be represented by Gregory Scaglione and J. Daniel Weidner of the Koley, Jessen Law Firm. Dan Ketcham and the law firm of Engles, Ketcham, Olson & Keith, P.C. will continue to represent Defendant BackYard Burgers, Inc. in this matter. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (KBJ)
|
June 21, 2011 |
Filing
19
ORDER - Plaintiff Brady Keith's and Defendant Back Yard Burgers of Nebraska, Inc.'s Stipulation for Extension of Time in which to Answer or Otherwise Plead 18 is hereby adopted; Defendant Back Yard Burgers of Nebraska, Inc.s and Back Yard Burgers, Inc.'s deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint is extended to August 21, 2011. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (KBJ)
|