Tyler v. Mayo et al
Plaintiff: |
Billy Tyler |
Defendant: |
Unknown Lewis and Unknown Mayo |
Case Number: |
8:2011cv00167 |
Filed: |
May 13, 2011 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nebraska |
Office: |
8 Omaha Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Joseph F. Bataillon |
Presiding Judge: |
Pro Se Docket |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights: Other |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
April 13, 2012 |
Filing
25
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The Clerk of the court shall not process the appeal to the Court of Appeals. The Clerk of the court shall provide the Court of Appeals with a copy of this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (AOA)
|
September 7, 2011 |
Filing
14
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis 13 is granted. The Clerk of the court shall provide the Court of Appeals with a copy of this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed/e-mailed to pro se party) (KBJ)
|
August 24, 2011 |
Filing
10
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - This matter is dismissed without prejudice because Plaintiff failed to prosecute this matter diligently and failed to comply with this court's orders. A separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed/e-mailed to pro se party)(KBJ)
|
July 15, 2011 |
Filing
9
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Complaint fails to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. However, Plaintiff shall have until August 15, 2011, to amend his Complaint to clearly state a claim upon which relief may be granted, in acco rdance with this Memorandum and Order. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint, Plaintiffs current Complaint (filing no. 1) will be dismissed without prejudice and without further notice for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: Review amended complaint on August 15, 2011; dismiss if not filed. Plaintiff's Motion for Order 6 and Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order 8 are denied. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed/e-mailed to pro se party)(KBJ)
|
June 8, 2011 |
Filing
7
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER provisionally granting 5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Complaint shall be filed without payment of fees. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(JAE)
|
May 17, 2011 |
Filing
4
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff must submit a signed application to proceed in forma pauperis, or pay the $350.00 filing fee, on or before June 13, 2011. Failure to comply with this Memorandum and Order will result in the dismissal of this mat ter without further notice. The Clerk of the court is directed to send Plaintiff the Form AO240, Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this matter with the following text: June 13, 2011: Check for MIFP or payment. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party with AO240 Form) (KBJ)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?