Turrentine-Sims v. State of Nebraska
Petitioner: |
Dinah Turrentine-Sims |
Respondent: |
State of Nebraska |
Interested Party: |
Nebraska Attorney General |
Case Number: |
8:2011cv00194 |
Filed: |
May 27, 2011 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nebraska |
Office: |
8 Omaha Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Pro Se Docket |
Presiding Judge: |
Lyle E. Strom |
Nature of Suit: |
Habeas Corpus (General) |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
October 12, 2011 |
Filing
18
ORDER AND JUDGMENT - Pursuant to the memorandum opinion entered herein this date, filing 17 , IT IS ORDERED that petitioner's Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus is dismissed without prejudice. All other pending motions are denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed/e-mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
|
July 7, 2011 |
Filing
9
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: Upon initial review of the Petition (Filing No. 1 ), the Court preliminarily determines that petitioner's claims, as set forth in this Memorandum and Order, are potentially cognizable in federal court. The clerk of the court is directed to mail copies of this Memorandum and Order and the Petition to Respondents and the Nebraska Attorney General by regular first-class mail. By August 8, 2011, respondent shall file a motion for summary judgment or state court records in support of an answer. The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: August 8, 2011: deadline for respondent to file state court records in support of answer or mot ion for summary judgment. No discovery shall be undertaken without leave of the Court. See Rule 6 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases in the United States District Courts. Petitioner's Motion to Appoint Counsel (Filing No. 3 ) is denied without prejudice to reassertion. Petitioner paid the $5.00 filing fee on June 13, 2011. Petitioner's Motion to Proceed IFP (Filing No. 2 ) is therefore denied as moot. Petitioner's "Motion for Bail Pending Appeal" (Filing No. 1-1, attach. 2, at CM/ECF pp. 18-19) is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed to pro se party and as directed)(TCL )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?