Walthers v. United States of America - Department of Veterans Affairs
Plaintiff: Geoffrey Walthers
Defendant: United States of America - Department of Veterans Affairs
Case Number: 8:2011cv00212
Filed: June 9, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Lyle E. Strom
Presiding Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1345 Medical Care Recovery
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER - The stipulation is approved and adopted; the motion for dismissal with prejudice is granted, each party to pay its own costs, complete record waived. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TEL)
May 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting 19 Motion to Substitute Plaintiff - Terry Talbott, as special administrator of the Estate of Geoffrey Walthers, is substituted as plaintiff in this action, and the caption shall be amended accordingly. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TEL)
October 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER - The Court notes that the parties in their report of planning conference (Filing No. 10 ) agree that the only defendant in this action should be the United States of America. IT IS ORDERED that the Department of Veterans Affairs is deleted as a party defendant in this action. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (JAB)
September 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 10/11/2011 08:15 AM in Chambers before Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TCL )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walthers v. United States of America - Department of Veterans Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America - Department of Veterans Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geoffrey Walthers
Represented By: Mandy L. Strigenz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?