Alper v. Gallup, Inc.
Plaintiff: Neil S. Alper
Defendant: Gallup, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2011cv00254
Filed: July 25, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 78 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 76 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy e-mailed to pro se party)(ADB)
March 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 63 Motion for Leave. All discovery, including any obligation to respond to outstanding discovery requests, is stayed pending the resolution of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (ADB )
March 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying without prejudice as moot 22 Motion for Leave, 30 Motion for Leave, 34 Motion for Leave, and 38 Motion to Compel. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy e-mailed to pro se party)(ADB)
December 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF CASE - This matter is before the court on Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time. (Filing No. 15 .) For good cause shown, and in order to progress this case to final resolution, the Motion is granted . The previous deadlines are modified as set forth. The Final Pretrial Conference will be held before the Magistrate Judge on September 12, 2012, at 10:00 a.m. The trial date will be set by the Magistrate Judge at the time of the Final Pretrial Conf erence. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: Pretrial conference before Magistrate Judge Cheryl Zwart to be held on September 12, 2012. No further extensions of time will be permitted. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Copy mailed/e-mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
September 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Gallup may proceed and service is now warranted. To obtain service of process on Defendant, Plaintiff must complete and return the summons form which the Clerk of the court will pr ovide. The Clerk of the court shall send ONE (1) summons form and ONE (1) USM-285 form to Plaintiff together with a copy of this Memorandum and Order. Plaintiff shall, as soon as possible, complete the forms and send the completed forms back to the C lerk of the court The Marshal shall serve the summons and Complaint without payment of costs or fees. Plaintiff is hereby notified that failure to obtain service of process on a defendant within 120 days of the date of this order may result in dismis sal of this matter without further notice as to such defendant. The Clerk of the Court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case with the following text: January 27, 2012: Check for completion of service of summons. ***Pro Se Case Management Deadlines: ( Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 1/27/2012.) Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed/ to pro se party with 1 USM-285 and 1 Summons)(MKR)
August 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER provisionally granting the 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and the Complaint shall be filed without payment of fees. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy emailed to pro se party)(MKR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alper v. Gallup, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neil S. Alper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gallup, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?