Coverall North America, Inc. v. Verica, L.L.C. et al
Plaintiff: |
Coverall North America, Inc. |
Defendant: |
Vicki Rhea and Verica, L.L.C. |
Case Number: |
8:2011cv00255 |
Filed: |
July 25, 2011 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nebraska |
Office: |
8 Omaha Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Joseph F. Bataillon |
Presiding Judge: |
Thomas D. Thalken |
Nature of Suit: |
Contract: Franchise |
Cause of Action: |
15 U.S.C. § 1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act) |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
November 15, 2013 |
Filing
139
ORDER granting 138 Stipulation for Dismissal. The above-captioned matter is dismissed with prejudice, including all claims and counterclaims, with each party to pay their own attorneys fees and costs. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (AOA)
|
May 2, 2013 |
Filing
122
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER -Verica, L.L.C.s Motion to Compel (Filing No. 67 ) is granted in part and denied in part. Vericas motion is granted with regard to Interrogatory Nos. 4, 5, 6, and 24, and Request for Production Nos. 17, 18, and 19, as those interrogatories and requests were amended by the court, and denied in all other respects. On or before May 14, 2013, Coverall shall amend its answers and responses as provided in this order and shall serve a complete privilege log, filing notice of such service. The court will hold a telephone conference on May 23, at 10:00 a.m. for the purpose of reviewing the preparation of the case to date and scheduling the case to trial. Plaintiffs counsel shall initiate the conference with the undersigned magistrate judge and participating counsel. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (MKR)
|
October 3, 2012 |
Filing
61
PROTECTIVE ORDER granting 60 Motion for Protective Order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TRL)
|
November 30, 2011 |
Filing
28
ORDER -The mediation stay allowed by the September 21, 2011, Mediation Reference Order (Filing No. 27 ) is hereby dissolved. Verica, L.L.C. shall have until December 15, 2011, to file an answer or otherwise respond to the plaintiffs Complaint (Fili ng No. 1 ). On or before January 5, 2012, the parties shall meet and confer and file a joint planning conference report in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f). ***Set/Reset All Deadlines: Verica, L.L.C. 12/15/2011.( Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 1/5/2012.) Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (MKR)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?