United States of America et al v. STABL, Inc.
Plaintiff: State of Nebraska and United States of America
Defendant: STABL, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2011cv00274
Filed: August 10, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Presiding Judge: F.A. Gossett
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1319 Clean Water Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 177 REASSIGNMENT ORDER - The above case is reassigned to Chief District Judge Laurie Smith Camp for disposition and to Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett for judicial supervision and processing of all pretrial matters. The Clerk of Court will file this order in Case No. 8:11-cv-274 and Case No. 8:16cv233. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (GJG)
June 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 176 REASSIGNMENT ORDER - The above case is reassigned to Chief District Judge Laurie Smith Camp for disposition and to Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett for judicial supervision and processing of all pretrial matters. The Clerk of Court will file this order in Case No. 8:11-cv-274. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (GJG)
May 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER TO WITHDRAW EXHIBITS. Counsel for parties are ordered to withdraw the non-jury trial exhibits previously submitted in this matter within 14 calendar days of the date of this order. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (MLF, )
March 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER denying 158 Motion for New Trial; for an Amended Judgment; for Judgment Notwithstanding the Verdict/Judgment; and for Stay. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (JSF)
September 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER that Defendant's Motion for Continuance; Request for Leave to File Opposition Expert Reports/Designations and Daubert Motions; Request for Hearing; Motion in Limine; and Clarification of Pre-Trial Order Setting Length of Trial 114 is denied. Defendant's 120 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading is denied. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (ADB)
August 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER RE: TRIAL PREPARATION (CIVIL NON-JURY TRIAL). Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (JB)
August 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER granting 107 Motion to Change Trial on Docket to Bench Trial. The Clerk of Court is directed to modify the docket sheet to reflect that trial of this matter will be to the bench, not a jury. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (JSF)
July 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 106 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the 101 Motion for Reconsideration filed by Defendant Stabl, Inc., is denied. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (ADB)
May 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER granting 92 Motion to Strike. Defendant is hereby precluded from using any testimony or evidence from Mrs. Leon A. Johnson, Kristen Nazar, John Sterling, William McMurtry, Jack Wolfe, Ozzie Romero, and Scott Philippe at the trial of this case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (ADB)
May 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER denying 80 Plaintiffs' Second Motion to Compel Answers to Interrogatories and Production of Documents. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (JSF)
May 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 98 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 59 Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on the Issue of Liability; denying as moot 73 Defendant's Motion to Strike; granting in part and denying in part 87 Defendant's Supplemental Motion to Strike. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (JSF)
April 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER AMENDING TRIAL DATE. Due to the non-jury trial scheduled to begin 5/7/2013 and expected to last approximately 14 days, this trial will be rescheduled. The Pretrial Conference is set for 8/26/2013 at 09:30 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. The Jury Trial is set for 9/17/2013 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (ARL, )
April 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER RE: TRIAL PREPARATION (CIVIL JURY TRIAL). Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (JB)
November 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 57 PROTECTIVE ORDER granting 56 Motion for Protective Order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (ADB)
November 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting 53 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. The Clerk of Court shall terminate the appearance of Jason Brinkley as counsel for Defendant and shall terminate future notices to him in this matter. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (ADB)
November 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER that plaintiff's 43 Motion to Compel is granted as outlined in the order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (ADB)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America et al v. STABL, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STABL, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Nebraska
Represented By: Katherine J. Spohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Laurie A. Kelly
Represented By: Katherine A. Loyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?