Andrews v. State of Nebraska et al
Plaintiff: |
Michael Andrews |
Defendant: |
State of Nebraska Douglas County Corrections, State of Nebraska Douglas County, City of Omaha Police Department, Fickell, Hanzek and State of Nebraska |
Case Number: |
8:2011cv00279 |
Filed: |
August 15, 2011 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nebraska |
Office: |
8 Omaha Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Pro Se Docket |
Presiding Judge: |
Lyle E. Strom |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights: Other |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
May 16, 2013 |
Filing
43
ORDER AND JUDGMENT - Pursuant to the Memorandum Opinion 42 entered herein this date, IT IS ORDERED: Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Filing No. 33 ) is granted, and plaintiff's claims against Officers Fickel and Hanzek in their individual capacities are dismissed with prejudice. Pursuant to the Court's orders from October 24, 2011, and January 19, 2012, plaintiff's claims against the State of Nebraska, the City of Omaha, the City of Omaha Police Department, Doug las County, Douglas County Corrections, Douglas County Sheriff, and Fickel and Hanzek in their official capacities are dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff's "Motion to Deny Summary Judgment" (Filing No. 36 ) is denied. Defendant s' Motion to Quash (Filing No. 40 ) is denied as moot. The clerk's office is directed to update the Court's records to reflect that defendants' names are Robert Fickel and David Hanzek. Judgment is entered in favor of defendan ts Robert Fickel and David Hanzek in their individual capacities, and against plaintiff Michael Andrews. Plaintiff shall take nothing and this case is dismissed with prejudice as to these defendants. Plaintiff's claims against the State of Nebr aska, the City of Omaha, the City of Omaha Police Department, Douglas County, Douglas County Corrections, Douglas County Sheriff, and Fickel and Hanzek in their official capacities are dismissed without prejudice. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL )
|
March 29, 2013 |
Filing
39
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Plaintiff has 30 days to supplement the record with (1) the "surveillance footage" and (2) the "authentic 'document' from the internal affairs of the Omaha Police Department." Plaintiff must su bmit an affidavit authenticating both items. The clerk's office is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: April 29, 2013: deadline to file supplement. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(ADB)
|
November 26, 2012 |
Filing
38
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the final pretrial conference in this matter, currently scheduled for November 29, 2012, is cancelled. The conference may be rescheduled after the resolution of defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL )
|
September 10, 2012 |
Filing
30
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that plaintiff's Motion to Compel (Filing No. 23 ) and "Motion for Judgment on Compel Discovery Pleadings" (Filing No. 29 ) are denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL )
|
October 24, 2011 |
Filing
9
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: Plaintiff shall have 30 days to amend his complaint to set forth a short and plain statement of his demand for relief, and also to clearly state a claim upon which relief may be granted against the City of Omaha and Douglas County, in accordance with this memorandum and order. If plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint, plaintiff's complaint will be dismissed without further notice for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. In t he event that plaintiff files an amended complaint, plaintiff shall restate the allegations of the current complaint (Filing No. 1 ), and any new allegations. Failure to consolidate all claims into one document may result in the abandonment of claim s. The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: Check for amended complaint on November 21, 2011, and dismiss if none filed. Plaintiff shall keep the Court informed of his current address at all times while this case is pending. Failure to do so may result in dismissal without further notice. To the extent plaintiff asserts claims for monetary damages against the State of Nebraska, those claims are dismissed. The Court reserv es the right to conduct further review of plaintiff's claims pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2) after plaintiff addresses the matters set forth in this memorandum and order. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL )
|
August 22, 2011 |
Filing
8
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Filing No. 4 ) is provisionally granted. The complaint shall be filed without payment of fees. Plaintiff's Motion for Payment (Filing No. 2 ) is denied.Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?