Strong v. Schenk Trucking, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
Bernard Strong |
Defendant: |
William Decker and Schenk Trucking, Inc. |
Case Number: |
8:2011cv00295 |
Filed: |
August 29, 2011 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nebraska |
Office: |
8 Omaha Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Joseph F. Bataillon |
Presiding Judge: |
F.A. Gossett |
Nature of Suit: |
Motor Vehicle |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal |
Jury Demanded By: |
Defendant |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
January 22, 2013 |
Filing
69
ORDER OF DISMISSAL regarding 68 STIPULATION for Dismissal With Prejudice. This matter is dismissed with prejudice, each party to pay their own costs. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (MKR)
|
December 7, 2012 |
Filing
65
ORDER pursuant to an agreement reached by the parties during a settlement conference with the undersigned on December 7, 2012. On or before January 7, 2013, the parties shall electronically file a joint stipulation for dismissal and shall submit t o Joseph F. Bataillon, a draft order which will fully dispose of the case. Absent compliance with this order, this case (including all counterclaims and the like may) may be dismissed without further notice; and The pretrial conference set for January 17, 2013 is cancelled upon the representation that this case is settled. ***Set/Reset All Deadlines: ( Dismissal Papers Deadline due by 1/7/2013.) Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (MKR)
|
November 8, 2012 |
Filing
62
SECOND AMENDED ORDER SETTING FINAL SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF CASE, granting 61 Motion to Extend Certain Progression Deadlines. The Pretrial Conference set for 1/17/2013 at 09:30 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett, and the Jury Trial set for 2/11/2013 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 3, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Judge Joseph F. Bataillon, remain as previously scheduled. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (ARL,)
|
July 13, 2012 |
Filing
55
ORDER overruling the Defendant's Objection 52 to Order on Appeal to Magistrate Judge Order. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (MKR)
|
May 10, 2012 |
Filing
42
ORDER granting the 41 Motion to Quash Notice of Deposition. Eugene Kling shall not be deposed on May 11, 2012, as currently scheduled. The parties may reschedule the deposition of Mr. Kling for a later date. The other depositions set to occur in this case on May 11, 2012, may proceed as planned. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (MKR)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?