Dyer v. Bakewell et al
Petitioner: |
Lewis Fitzgerald Dyer |
Respondent: |
Nebraska State Penitentiary and Dennis Bakewell |
Interested Party: |
Nebraska Attorney General |
Case Number: |
8:2011cv00312 |
Filed: |
September 15, 2011 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nebraska |
Office: |
8 Omaha Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Laurie Smith Camp |
Presiding Judge: |
Pro Se Docket |
Nature of Suit: |
Habeas Corpus (General) |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 22, 2012 |
Filing
30
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Petitioner's Motion for Leave to Appeal in Forma Pauperis (Filing No. 29 ) is granted. Petitioner's Motion for Certificate of Appealability (Filing No. 27 ) is denied without prejudice to reassertion before the Eighth Circuit. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (Copy provided to 8th Circuit as directed) (TEL)
|
May 4, 2012 |
Filing
25
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Petitioner Lewis Fitzgerald Dyer's Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing No. 1 ) is dismissed with prejudice. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (TEL)
|
October 6, 2011 |
Filing
12
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER regarding Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 1 filed by Lewis Fitzgerald Dyer. Upon initial review of the habeas corpus petition (Filing No. 1 ), the court preliminarily determines that claims One and Two are potentially cogniz able in federal court. The court decides that Claim Three is not cognizable in a federal court habeas action and is therefore dismissed. Petitioner's request for the appointment of counsel (Filing No. 5 ) is denied without prejudice to reassert ion. Clerk to mail copies. By November 21, 2011, the respondent shall file a motion for summary judgment or state court records in support of an answer. ***Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 11/21/2011: deadline for respondent to file state cour t records in support of answer or motion for summary judgment. Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for December 21, 2011: check for respondent to file answer and separate brief. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party and as directed)(JAB)
|
September 27, 2011 |
Filing
10
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Petitioner's application to proceed IFP (Filing No. 2 ) is denied. Petitioner is granted until October 27, 2011 to pay the $5.00 filing fee. Petitioner is warned that if the fee is not paid as required, the court ma y dismiss this case without further notice. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: October 27, 2011: deadline for Petitioner to pay $5.00 filing fee. No further review of this case will take place until the filing fee is paid.Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed/e-mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?