Cowley et al v. Cabela's Outdoor Adventures, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
Eric Cowley and Gillian Cowley |
"Cabela": |
Cabela's Outdoor Adventures, Inc. |
Pawlak: |
Eric Pawlak |
"Roberts": |
Fred Roberts |
Case Number: |
8:2011cv00325 |
Filed: |
September 23, 2011 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nebraska |
Office: |
8 Omaha Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Joseph F. Bataillon |
Presiding Judge: |
Pro Se Docket |
Nature of Suit: |
P.I.: Other |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
January 7, 2013 |
Filing
39
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER -In accordance with this Memorandum and Order and the court's December 12, 2012, Memorandum and Order (filing no. 38 ), this matter is dismissed without prejudice and without further notice. The Clerk of Court is direc ted to send a certified copy of this Memorandum and Order to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the District of Alaska. A separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party and as directed )(MKR)
|
December 12, 2012 |
Filing
38
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER -By December 18, 2012, the parties shall inform the court whether they would like this case transferred to the District of Alaska for further proceedings, or whether they would like this case dismissed without prejudice. If the parties fail to respond by December 18, 2012, the court will dismiss this matter without prejudice and without further notice. ( Case Management Deadline set for 12/18/2012). Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (MKR)
|
August 14, 2012 |
Filing
29
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER -Cabelas and Pawlak shall have until August 21, 2012, to file an answer or other responsive pleading. In the event that Cabelas and Pawlak do not file an answer or otherwise plead by that date, Plaintiffs will be given the opportunity to seek a default judgment. ***Pro Se Case Management Deadlines: ( Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 8/21/2012.) Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
|
July 19, 2012 |
Filing
27
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER-Roberts shall have until July 27, 2012, to file an answer or otherresponsive pleading. In the event that Roberts does not file an answer or otherwise plead by that date, Plaintiffs will be given the opportunity to seek a default judgment. The Clerk of the court is directed to provide a copy of this Memorandum and Order to Roberts at the address shown on the executed summons form. ( Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 7/27/2012: Check for response from Roberts.) Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
|
July 17, 2012 |
Filing
26
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER -The parties shall have until July 23, 2012, to update the court regarding the status of their ADR efforts ***Set All Deadlines: ( Status Report due by 7/23/2012.) Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
|
December 23, 2011 |
Filing
23
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting the parties' Joint 19 Stipulation. The parties shall update the court regarding the status of this matter by January 20, 2012. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: Check for status update on January 21, 2012. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed/e-mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?