Lopez v. ATM Network, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Alexandra Lopez
Defendant: Money on Demand, LLC, Worldpay US, Inc. and ATM Network, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2011cv00416
Filed: December 8, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: F.A. Gossett
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1601 Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. This case is dismissed with prejudice and on the merits. The parties are responsible for their own costs and attorney fees. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (MKR)
March 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Upon notice of settlement given to the magistrate judge, On or before March 30, 2012, the parties shall electronically file a joint stipulation for dismissal (or other dispositive stipulation) and shall submit to the Honorable Joseph F. Batai llon, at bataillon@ned.uscourts.gov, a draft order which will fully dispose of the case. If the case is being dismissed, the stipulation shall comply with Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a) and shall state whether the dismissal is with or without prejudice . Absent compliance with this order, this case (including all counterclaims and the like) may be dismissed without further notice. The Rule 26(f) report and show cause deadlines are terminated upon the representation that this case is settled. ( Dismissal Papers Deadline due by 3/30/2012.). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (MKR)
March 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER - The parties shall report to the court in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) on or before the close of business on March 29, 2012, or show cause why sanctions should not be imposed upon them in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(f). ( Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 3/29/2012.) Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (MKR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez v. ATM Network, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Money on Demand, LLC
Represented By: David E. Copple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Worldpay US, Inc.
Represented By: Paul R. Gwilt
Represented By: Jason P. Stiehl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATM Network, Inc.
Represented By: David E. Krause
Represented By: James B. Hovland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexandra Lopez
Represented By: Tracy L. Hightower-Henne
Represented By: Michael P. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?