Struyk v. Holmes, Murphy & Associates, Inc.
Plaintiff: Kathleen Fridholm, Patricia Galvin , NE, Marlys Gorseth, Deborah Rasmussen, Jack Struyk, Jr., The Kansas City Series of Lockton Companies LLC, Cynthia Carlson and Jane Dambrosia
Defendant: Holmes, Murphy & Associates, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2011cv03151
Filed: September 6, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Presiding Judge: F.A. Gossett
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint and any and all claims set forth therein and the Counterclaim-Plaintiffs' Counterclaims and any and all claims set forth therein are all dismissed with prejudice, with each party to pay its own costs and fees. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (TCL )
August 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER approving 68 Stipulation. The Clerk of Court is directed to restrict access to filing nos. 1-1, 8-1, 18-7, 34-1, 36, 43, 60, 60-2 and 60-3 to court users and case participants. The Clerk of Court is further directed to attach the corresponding redacted documents included with the parties' stipulation (filing 68 ) to the appropriate entry(ies). Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (GJG)
May 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER - The Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Defendant (filing 53 ) is granted. The Clerk of Court shall terminate the appearance of Gene R La Suer, Sharon K. Malheiro and Michael C. Richards as counsel for Defendant and shall terminate future notices to these individuals in this matter. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (GJG)
March 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER - THEREFORE, THE COURT ORDERS the parties and the Clerk of Court to proceed as follows: Henceforth, all filings shall occur in case number 8:11CV3151.1 The Clerk of Court shall close case number 8:11CV427. The plaintiffs in case number 8: 11CV3151 shall have 20 days from the date of this order to file an amended complaint which includes all the relevant allegations contained in both cases, 8:11CV3151 and 8:11CV427. Thereafter, the defendant shall have 20 days after the filing of th e amended complaint to file its amended answer, counterclaims, cross-claims or third- party claims, or other appropriate motions. The Clerk of Court shall file this order in both cases. Thereafter, all filings will occur only in case number 8:11CV3 151. All attorneys who are involved in this case shall register with cm/ecf within 48 hours of the date of this order. This order will not change the April 20, 2012, deadlines set by the magistrate judge. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (TCL )
March 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER - Until further court order, this case is consolidated with Case No. 8:11CV427 for purposes of progression matters and discovery. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (TEL)
December 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER denying 9 Motion to Change Venue - All matters in this case are stayed pending mediation. By or before January 31, 2012, the parties shall submit a joint status report to the court stating whether the case has been settled. The stay of this matter shall be without prejudice to raising issues of expedited discovery or requests for preliminary injunctions. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (TEL)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Struyk v. Holmes, Murphy & Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Fridholm
Represented By: Mark A. Fahleson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Galvin , NE
Represented By: Mark A. Fahleson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlys Gorseth
Represented By: Mark A. Fahleson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Rasmussen
Represented By: Mark A. Fahleson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Struyk, Jr.
Represented By: Michael F. Coyle
Represented By: Mark A. Fahleson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Kansas City Series of Lockton Companies LLC
Represented By: Mark A. Fahleson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Carlson
Represented By: Mark A. Fahleson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Dambrosia
Represented By: Mark A. Fahleson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holmes, Murphy & Associates, Inc.
Represented By: A. Stevenson Bogue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?