Starks v. Wells Fargo, NA et al
Plaintiff: Kevin Isaac Starks
Defendant: Wachovia Mortgage Corproation, Wells Fargo, NA, World Savings Inc. and Eric H. Lindquist
Case Number: 8:2012cv00006
Filed: January 6, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that: This matter is dismissed without prejudice. A separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL )
December 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER- Plaintiff shall have until January 10, 2013, to show cause why this case should not be dismissed for failure to complete service of process. If Plaintiff does not respond, or if good cause is not shown, this action will be dis missed without prejudice and without further notice. ( Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 1/10/2013: deadline for Plaintiff to show cause why service of process was not completed.) Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (MKR)
September 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiffs Motion to Alter or Amend (Filing No. 12 ) is granted. The Clerk of the court is directed to reopen this matter; Plaintiff must complete service of process on Defendants. The Clerk of the court shall send FOUR (4 ) summons forms and FOUR (4) USM-285 forms to Plaintiff together with a copy of this Memorandum and Order. Plaintiff is granted, on the courts own motion, an extension of time until November 6, 2012, to complete service of process; ***Pro Se Case Management Deadlines: ( Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 11/6/2012: check for completion of service of summons.) Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party as directed )(MKR)
March 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Complaint is dismissed without prejudice. A separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (TEL)
February 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff Kevin Isaac Starks shall pay an initial partial filing fee of $4.86 by 3/12/2012, unless an enlargement of time is granted in response to a written motion. Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 3/12/2012: initial partial filing fee payment due. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copies mailed as directed and to pro se party)(MKR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Starks v. Wells Fargo, NA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Isaac Starks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wachovia Mortgage Corproation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo, NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: World Savings Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric H. Lindquist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?