Charvat v. Mutual First Federal Credit Union
Plaintiff: Jarek Charvat
Defendant: Mutual First Federal Credit Union
Case Number: 8:2012cv00011
Filed: January 8, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Presiding Judge: F.A. Gossett
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1601 Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER OF DISMISSAL - The parties' Joint Stipulated Motion to Dismiss (Filing No. 45 ) is approved. The above-captioned action is dismissed with prejudice. The Court will not assess costs or attorney's fees. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (GJG)
July 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER - The Court lacks subject matter jurisdiction over the Plaintiff's action. The Plaintiff's Complaint is dismissed, with prejudice. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (GJG)
July 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - IT IS ORDERED that on or before July 9, 2012, the parties may file a response to this Order, showing cause, if any, as to why this action should not be dismissed for lack of standing. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (TCL )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Charvat v. Mutual First Federal Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jarek Charvat
Represented By: Tracy L. Hightower-Henne
Represented By: Michael P. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mutual First Federal Credit Union
Represented By: Monica L. Freeman
Represented By: Todd W. Weidemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?