Yellow Horse et al v. Dawes County Jail et al
Plaintiff: |
Darin little white man and Dale Yellow Horse |
Defendant: |
Steve Crile, Karl J. Bailey and Dawes County Jail |
Case Number: |
8:2012cv00016 |
Filed: |
January 10, 2012 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nebraska |
Office: |
8 Omaha Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Pro Se Docket |
Presiding Judge: |
Richard G. Kopf |
Nature of Suit: |
Prisoner: Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
April 16, 2012 |
Filing
20
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff Darin little white man's Complaint (filing no. 1 ) is dismissed without prejudice because he failed to comply with this court's orders. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (TEL)
|
March 27, 2012 |
Filing
17
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER- Plaintiff Dale Yellow Horses claims (filing no. 1 ) is dismissed without prejudice because he failed to comply with this courts orders. The Clerk of the court is directed to terminate Plaintiff Dale Yellow Horse as a plaintiff in this matter. Party Dale Yellow Horse terminated. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
|
March 2, 2012 |
Filing
16
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting the Plaintiff's 14 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff Darin little white man shall pay an initial partial filing fee of $8.00 by 4/2/2012, unless an enlargement of time is granted in response to a written motion. The Clerk of the court is directed to send a copy of this order to the appropriate official at Plaintiffs institution. Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 4/2/2012:initial partial filing feepayment due. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copies mailed as directed)(MKR)
|
February 10, 2012 |
Filing
13
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER on the courts own motion. Plaintiff Darin Little White Man is directed to correct the above-listed technical defects in the Complaint on or before March 12, 2012. By this date, Plaintiff Darin Little White Man must sign the Comp laint, and either pay the $350.00 filing fee or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Failure to comply with this Memorandum and Order will result in dismissal of this matter without further notice as to Plaintiff Darin Little White Man. The Clerk of the court is directed to send to Plaintiff Darin Little White Man the Form AO240, Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadlin e in this matter with the following text: March 12, 2012 ***Pro Se Case Management Deadlines: ( Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 3/12/2012: Check for MIFP or payment and signed Complaint). Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed/e-mailed to pro se party with AO240 form)(MKR)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?