Brown et al v. Providence Medical Center, et al
Plaintiff: |
Jeff Brown and Sherri Gothier |
Defendant: |
Mercy Health Services, Mercy Medical Services and Mercy Medical Center |
Wayne, Nebraska: |
Providence Medical Center |
Case Number: |
8:2012cv00031 |
Filed: |
January 20, 2012 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nebraska |
Office: |
8 Omaha Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Laurie Smith Camp |
Presiding Judge: |
F.A. Gossett |
Nature of Suit: |
Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Medical Malpractice |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 24, 2013 |
Filing
104
ORDER OF DISMISSAL - The Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss with prejudice (Filing No. 103 ) is granted. This case is dismissed with prejudice. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (GJG)
|
July 31, 2013 |
Filing
101
ORDER - The Motion for Leave to Withdraw (filing 100 ) is granted. The Clerk of Court shall terminate Heather Anschutz's appearance for Defendant Mercy Health Services and shall terminate future notices to Ms. Anschutz in this action. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (GJG)
|
May 24, 2013 |
Filing
93
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The Statement of Objections to Magistrate Judge's Order (Filing No. 88 ) filed by the Plaintiffs is overruled. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (GJG)
|
April 9, 2013 |
Filing
87
ORDER - Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend Complaint (filing 73 ) is denied. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (GJG)
|
February 5, 2013 |
Filing
77
ORDER - The unopposed Motion to Dismiss Providence Medical Center (Only) (Filing No. 72 ) is granted. All claims for relief stated in the Plaintiffs' Complaint against Defendant Providence Medical Center (Wayne, Nebraska), are dismissed with prejudice. To the extent not otherwise agreed upon by the parties, the affected parties will bear their own costs and attorney's fees. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (GJG)
|
March 8, 2012 |
Filing
39
AMENDED ORDER that the Defendants' Motions for Attorney Fees, Costs and Expenses and Motion to Stay, Pending Payment 28 and 34 are granted, in part, as follows: This action is stayed pending resolution of the Defendants' Motions for Attorney Fees, Costs and Expenses; and the Court will defer ruling on the Motions for Attorney Fees, Costs, and Expenses, pending the receipt of all briefs and evidentiary submissions of the parties. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (JB)
|
March 7, 2012 |
Filing
38
ORDER that the Defendants' Motion for Attorney Fees, Costs and Expenses and Motion to Stay, Pending Payment 34 is granted, in part, as follows: This action is stayed pending resolution of the Defendants' Motion for Attorney Fees, Costs and Expenses; and the Court will defer ruling on the Motion for Attorney Fees, Costs, and Expenses, pending the receipt of all briefs and evidentiary submissions of the parties. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (JB)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?