Bunzl Processor Distribution, LLC v. Bettcher Industries, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Bunzl Processor Distribution, LLC
Defendant: Bettcher Industries, Inc. and Exact Manufacturing & Machine, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2012cv00054
Filed: February 8, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: FA Gossett
Referring Judge: Lyle E Strom
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 6, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2012 Filing 38 REPORT on the determination of an action regarding patent. Order filed on 7/6/12. Notification sent to the U.S. Patent Office. (Attachments: #1 Order) (ADB)
July 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER NUNC PRO TUNC that the joint motion to dismiss #35 is granted. Claims I, II and IV of the complaint are dismissed with prejudice. Claim III of the complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Bettcher Industries, Inc.'s counterclaims and crossclaims against Bunzl and Exact are dismissed with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (ADB)
July 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #35 Motion to Dismiss. Claims I, II and IV of the complaint are dismissed with prejudice as between Bunzl and Exact Manufacturing & Machine, Inc. Claim III of the complaint is dismissed without prejudice as between Bunzl and Exact Manufacturing & Machine, Inc. Bettcher Industries, Inc.'s counterclaims and crossclaims against Bunzel and Exact are dismissed with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (ADB)
July 3, 2012 Filing 35 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Joint Motion to Dismiss of Bunzl Processor, Bettcher Industries, and Exact Manufacturing by Attorney Michael T. Hilgers on behalf of Defendant Bettcher Industries, Inc..(Hilgers, Michael)
June 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #33 Motion to Extend; plaintiff shall have until June 29, 2012, within which to file an opposition to #24 Motion to Dismiss; and the parties shall have until June 29, 2012, to submit their planning conference report. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (ADB)
June 7, 2012 Filing 33 Joint MOTION to Extend Scheduling Packet #19 , MOTION to Dismiss Motion to Dismiss, Transfer Venue, or Stay Plaintiff's Complaint for Declaratory Judgment and Conditional Relief #24 by Attorney John P. Passarelli on behalf of Plaintiff Bunzl Processor Distribution, LLC.(Passarelli, John)
April 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #31 Motion to Extend. Plaintiff shall have until June 8, 2012, within which to file an opposition to the motion to dismiss, and the parties shall have until June 8, 2012, to submit their planning conference report. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (ADB, )
April 12, 2012 Filing 31 Joint MOTION to Extend (Report of Parties' Planning Conference and opposition papers to #24 motion to dismiss Scheduling Packet #19 , MOTION to Dismiss Motion to Dismiss, Transfer Venue, or Stay Plaintiff's Complaint for Declaratory Judgment and Conditional Relief #24 by Attorney John P. Passarelli on behalf of Plaintiff Bunzl Processor Distribution, LLC.(Passarelli, John)
April 2, 2012 Filing 30 ANSWER to Complaint, #1 by Attorney Stacy L. Morris on behalf of Defendant Exact Manufacturing & Machine, Inc.(Morris, Stacy)
April 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #26 Motion to Restrict pursuant to the E-Government Act. Filing no. #28 shall remain a restricted document pending further order of the Court. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (JSF)
March 30, 2012 Filing 28 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT regarding MOTION to Restrict pursuant to the E-Government Act Motion for Leave to File Exhibits I and J to Motion to Dismiss as Restricted Access Documents #26 ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). - by Attorney Michael T. Hilgers on behalf of Defendant Bettcher Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I, #2 Exhibit J)(Hilgers, Michael)
March 30, 2012 Filing 27 INDEX in support of MOTION to Dismiss Motion to Dismiss, Transfer Venue, or Stay Plaintiff's Complaint for Declaratory Judgment and Conditional Relief #24 by Attorney Michael T. Hilgers on behalf of Defendant Bettcher Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I (filed as restricted access), #11 Exhibit J (filed as restricted access), #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M)(Hilgers, Michael)
March 30, 2012 Filing 26 MOTION to Restrict pursuant to the E-Government Act Motion for Leave to File Exhibits I and J to Motion to Dismiss as Restricted Access Documents by Attorney Michael T. Hilgers on behalf of Defendant Bettcher Industries, Inc..(Hilgers, Michael)
March 30, 2012 Filing 25 BRIEF in support of MOTION to Dismiss Motion to Dismiss, Transfer Venue, or Stay Plaintiff's Complaint for Declaratory Judgment and Conditional Relief #24 by Attorney Michael T. Hilgers on behalf of Defendant Bettcher Industries, Inc..(Hilgers, Michael)
March 30, 2012 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss Motion to Dismiss, Transfer Venue, or Stay Plaintiff's Complaint for Declaratory Judgment and Conditional Relief by Attorney Michael T. Hilgers on behalf of Defendant Bettcher Industries, Inc..(Hilgers, Michael)
March 19, 2012 Filing 23 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Stacy L. Morris on behalf of Defendant Exact Manufacturing & Machine, Inc..(Morris, Stacy)
March 15, 2012 Filing 22 APPLICATION/ORDER admitting pro hac vice Attorney Nicholas J. Lamb for Plaintiff Bunzl Processor Distribution, LLC. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (GJG)
March 12, 2012 Filing 21 APPLICATION/ORDER admitting pro hac vice Attorney Alan H. Norman for Plaintiff Bunzl Processor Distribution, LLC. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (GJG)
March 12, 2012 Filing 20 APPLICATION/ORDER admitting pro hac vice Attorney Jason Schwent for Plaintiff Bunzl Processor Distribution, LLC. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (GJG)
March 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING PACKET - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 4/13/2012.Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TCL )
March 2, 2012 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Exact Manufacturing & Machine, Inc. on 2/10/2012. (Passarelli, John) Modified on 3/5/2012 to correct service date of summons (JSF).
March 2, 2012 Filing 17 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Exact Manufacturing & Machine, Inc.. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(ADB, )
March 2, 2012 Filing 16 TEXT ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Exact Manufacturing & Machine, Inc. answer due 4/2/2012. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (ADB, )
March 1, 2012 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Plead by Attorney Stacy L. Morris on behalf of Defendant Exact Manufacturing & Machine, Inc..(Morris, Stacy)
March 1, 2012 Filing 14 APPLICATION/ORDER admitting pro hac vice Attorney Thomas H. Shunk for Defendant Bettcher Industries, Inc.. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (ADB, )
March 1, 2012 Filing 13 APPLICATION/ORDER admitting pro hac vice Attorney George L. Pinchak for Defendant Bettcher Industries, Inc.. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (ADB, )
March 1, 2012 Filing 12 APPLICATION/ORDER admitting pro hac vice Attorney David Kitchen for Defendant Bettcher Industries, Inc.. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (ADB, )
February 24, 2012 Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Bettcher Industries, Inc. answer due 3/30/2012. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (ADB)
February 24, 2012 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Attorney Michael T. Hilgers on behalf of Defendant Bettcher Industries, Inc..(Hilgers, Michael)
February 15, 2012 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Michael T. Hilgers on behalf of Defendant Bettcher Industries, Inc..(Hilgers, Michael)
February 15, 2012 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Michael T. Hilgers on behalf of Defendant Bettcher Industries, Inc. (Hilgers, Michael)
February 10, 2012 Filing 7 REPORT on the filing of an action regarding patent. Complaint filed on 2/8/12. Notification sent to the U.S. Patent Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (ADB)
February 8, 2012 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to defendants Bettcher Industries, Inc. and Exact Manufacturing & Machine, Inc. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (TEL)
February 8, 2012 Filing 5 Summons Requested as to Exact Manufacturing & Machine, Inc. regarding Complaint, #1 . (Passarelli, John)
February 8, 2012 Filing 4 Summons Requested as to Bettcher Industries, Inc. regarding Complaint, #1 . (Passarelli, John)
February 8, 2012 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent Bunzl Distribution Midcentral, Inc., Corporate Parent Bunzl Distribution Midcentral, Inc., Corporate Parent Bunzl Distribution USA, Inc., Corporate Parent Bunzl Distribution USA, Inc., Corporate Parent Bunzl USA, Inc., Corporate Parent Bunzl USA, Inc., Corporate Parent Bunzl USA Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent Bunzl USA Holdings, LLC for Bunzl Processor Distribution, LLC. by Attorney John P. Passarelli on behalf of Plaintiffs Bunzl Processor Distribution, LLC, Bunzl Distribution Midcentral, Inc., Bunzl Distribution Midcentral, Inc., Bunzl Distribution USA, Inc., Bunzl Distribution USA, Inc., Bunzl USA, Inc., Bunzl USA, Inc., Bunzl USA Holdings, LLC, Bunzl USA Holdings, LLC.(Passarelli, John)
February 8, 2012 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom and Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett assigned. (AOA)
February 8, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Bettcher Industries, Inc., Exact Manufacturing & Machine, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0867-2211477), by Attorney John P. Passarelli on behalf of Bunzl Processor Distribution, LLC(Passarelli, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bunzl Processor Distribution, LLC v. Bettcher Industries, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bettcher Industries, Inc.
Represented By: David Kitchen
Represented By: Carrie S. Dolton
Represented By: George L. Pinchak
Represented By: Michael T. Hilgers
Represented By: Thomas H. Shunk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exact Manufacturing & Machine, Inc.
Represented By: William M. Lamson, Jr.
Represented By: Stacy L. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bunzl Processor Distribution, LLC
Represented By: Nicholas J. Lamb
Represented By: John P. Passarelli
Represented By: Alan H. Norman
Represented By: James M. Sulentic
Represented By: Jason M. Schwent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?