Melgoza Ramirez v. Britten
Petitioner: |
Juan A. Melgoza Ramirez |
Respondent: |
Fred Britten |
Interested Party: |
Nebraska Attorney General |
Case Number: |
8:2012cv00074 |
Filed: |
February 21, 2012 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nebraska |
Office: |
8 Omaha Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Pro Se Docket |
Presiding Judge: |
Lyle E. Strom |
Nature of Suit: |
Habeas Corpus (General) |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
November 14, 2012 |
Filing
20
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 19 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis; The Court declines to issue a certificate of appealability without prejudice to petitioner seeking a certificate of appealability in the Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals; The clerk of the court shall provide the Court of Appeals a copy of this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(ADB)
|
October 1, 2012 |
Filing
17
ORDER AND JUDGMENT - Petitioner Juan A. Melgoza Ramirez's Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing No. 1 ) is dismissed with prejudice. All pending motions are denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
|
March 9, 2012 |
Filing
4
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Upon initial review of the petition 1 , the Court preliminarily determines that petitioner's claim, as set forth in this memorandum and order, is potentially cognizable in federal court. By April 23, 2012, responden t shall file a motion for summary judgment or state court records in support of an answer. The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: April 23, 2012: deadline for responden t to file state court records in support of answer or motion for summary judgment. If respondent elects to file a motion for summary judgment, the procedures set forth in the order shall be followed by respondent and petitioner. If respondent ele cts to file an answer, the procedures set forth in the order shall be followed by respondent and petitioner. The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: May 23, 2012: check for respondent to file answer and separate brief. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (copies mailed to respondent and Nebraska Attorney General as directed)(ADB)
|
February 29, 2012 |
Filing
3
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the Petitioner is directed to correct the technical defect in the petition on or before March 29, 2012. Failure to comply with this Memorandum and Order will result in dismissal of this matter without further notice. The clerk of the court send to petitioner the Form AO240, Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit. The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case with the following text: March 29, 2012: deadline to submit IFP application or pay the $5.00 filing fee. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed/e-mailed to pro se party with AO240 Form)(ADB)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?