May 12, 2014 |
Filing
230
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: Any pending claims against the United States in the above-captioned matter are dismissed with prejudice. Any pending claims between defendants in the above-captioned matter are dismissed without prejudice. Mic hael S. Luther's Motion to Dismiss (Filing No. 220 ); Laura Dodge Luther's joinder to Michael S. Luther's Motion to Dismiss (Filing No. 223 ); and the Objections submitted by Defendant Gerald C. Korth (Filing No. 224 ) and Defendant Atelier Partners (Filing No. 225 ) are denied as moot. A separate judgment will follow. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (TCL )
|
April 21, 2014 |
Filing
229
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - On or before May 5, 2014, each party with any pending claim will file a memorandum showing cause why the claim should not be dismissed by this Court due to lack of subject-matter jurisdiction, and why this Court should not enter a final judgment in the above-captioned matter. Show Cause Deadline set for 5/9/2014. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (AOA)
|
April 1, 2014 |
Filing
219
ORDER OF DISMISSAL - The Stipulation and Joint Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice (Filing No. 218 ) is approved. All claims and counterclaims between the Stipulating Parties in the above-captioned matter are dismissed with prejudice. The Stipulating Parties will pay their own costs and attorney's fees. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (AOA)
|
March 13, 2014 |
Filing
217
ORDER - Defendant Gerald Korth's Motion to Compel (filing 203 ) is denied. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (AOA)
|
November 19, 2013 |
Filing
192
ORDER - The parties shall mediate this case by or before January 15, 2014. Motions for summary judgment or other dispositive motions shall be filed by January 20, 2014. Pretrial disclosures shall be made no later than March 28, 2014. Motions i n limine shall be filed by or before April 11, 2014. The Final Pretrial Conference with the undersigned Magistrate Judge is set for May 19, 2014 at 9:30 a.m., in chambers, 111 South 18th Plaza, Suite 2210, Roman L. Hruska United States Courthouse, Omaha, Nebraska. A non-jury trial is set to commence, at the Court's call, during the week of June 17, 2014, in Omaha, Nebraska, before the Honorable Laurie Smith Camp, Chief United States District Judge. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (AOA)
|
September 23, 2013 |
Filing
182
ORDER - The Motion to Withdraw as Counsel (filing 181 ) is granted. Mr. Betterman shall immediately serve copies of this Order on Michael Luther and thereafter file proof of service showing compliance with this Order, listing the names and add resses of the persons to whom notice was sent. Mr. Betterman will not be relieved of applicable duties to the Court, Mr. Luther and opposing counsel until proof of service is filed. Upon Mr. Betterman's submission of proof of service as described in Paragraph 2 of this Order, the Clerk of Court shall terminate Mr. Betterman's appearance as counsel and cease further notices to him in this matter. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (AOA)
|
July 16, 2013 |
Filing
157
PROTECTIVE ORDER - Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (AOA)
|
June 20, 2013 |
Filing
143
ORDER - Laura Dodge Luther's Motion for Protective Order (filing 118 )is granted, in part. By or before July 5, 2013, the parties shall jointly submit a proposed protective order which incorporates the rulings delineated herein. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (AOA)
|
May 21, 2013 |
Filing
122
ORDER - Defendant Michael Luther's Motion for Leave to File Amended Answer and Counterclaim (filing 116 ) and Defendant Laura Dodge Luther's Motion for Leave to File First Amended Answer and Counterclaims (filing 117 ) are granted. Michael Luther and Laura Dodge Luther shall file their proposed amended answers by or before May 23, 2013. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (AOA)
|
January 24, 2013 |
Filing
100
ORDER granting 99 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. The Clerk of Court shall terminate the appearances of Patrick Betterman and the Law Offices of W. Patrick Betterman as counsel of record for Michael Luther and shall terminate future notices to Pa trick Betterman and the Law Offices of W. Patrick Betterman in this matter. This matter will be stayed until March 4, 2013, to allow Michael Luther to obtain new counsel. By or before March 4, 2013, Michael Luther shall have new counsel enter an appearance on his behalf or, alternatively, advise the Court that he wishes to proceed pro se. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (JAB)
|
April 11, 2012 |
Filing
13
ORDER - The Answer (Filing No. 5 ) of the Defendant, State of Nebraska, Department of Revenue, considered as a motion to dismiss a party, is granted; and this action is dismissed as against the Defendant, State of Nebraska, Department of Revenue, with prejudice, with each party to pay its own costs. Party Nebraska Department of Revenue terminated. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (TEL)
|