March 13, 2015 |
Filing
525
ORDER - the Court adopts the joint proposed designations and redactions (Filing No. 524). The court reporter shall redact the proposed Designations and Redactions and file the final, redacted Daily Trial Transcripts on or before April 3, 2015. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (MBM)
|
February 23, 2015 |
Filing
523
ORDER This matter comes before the Court on the parties' proposed permanent redactions 520 to the trial transcript. Pursuant to its previous order (Filing No. 500), the Court finds as follows. It is ordered that the parties' unconteste d redactions are adopted. AT&T's redactions for the only contested portion of the transcript are adopted. The Court Reporter shall file the final, redacted transcript within twenty-one days of this order. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (SLP)
|
January 30, 2015 |
Filing
500
ORDER granting 492 request for transcript (Non-Party) and AT&T's request for transcript 499 at the expense of each ordering party; directing court reporter to transcribe the entirety of the trial held October 14-October 23, 2014; granting AT&T's unopposed motion to seal the trial transcript 493 and court reporter is permitted to sell and disseminate copies of this unredacted sealed transcript only to the parties and non-parties pursuant to the terms and conditions of the joint stipulation 496 . Directions on redaction set forth. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (CCB)
|
December 29, 2014 |
Filing
498
ORDER granting 497 Stipulation for Dismissal. The stipulation of the parties is approved and adopted. The joint motion is granted. This action is dismissed with prejudice as to all of Primss claims against AT&T Mobility and to all of AT&T Mobilitys claims against Prism. Each party shall bear its own costs and attorney fees. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (MBM)
|
November 21, 2014 |
Filing
495
ORDER granting 494 Joint Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond to Motion to Seal. The parties have until November 21, 2014, to respond to the motion to seal (Filing No. 493). Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (SLP)
|
October 21, 2014 |
Filing
477
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that this matter is before the Court on the objections 467 of plaintiff Prism regarding certain trialissues. Plaintiff's objection regarding the Frankel Reference is sustained, and it is excluded. Plaintiff's objec tion regarding Mr. Taylor is sustained, and he may not offer testimony on the Fox reference. Plaintiff's objection regarding Mr. Neal is overruled. The Court's order (Filing No. 421) stands. The Court defers the question of Mr. Greendyk until the time of his testimony. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (ADB)
|
October 20, 2014 |
Filing
469
ORDER that the parties' joint stipulation (Filing No. 450) is approved and adopted. Plaintiff's motion (Filing No. 448) is granted. The Court defers consideration on objections (Filing No. 444, Filing No. 445, Filing No. 446). Defendant 's motion to compel (Filing No. 435) is denied. Defendant's motion to preclude Prism's untimely and improper alternative damages theory and new damages evidence, or in the alternative, to continue the trial date and reopen discovery on damages (Filing No. 441) is denied. Plaintiff's objections to Ms. Davis' testifying at trial (Filing No. 462) are denied. Her testimony must be limited per this Court's order (Filing No. 425). Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (ADB)
|
October 6, 2014 |
Filing
427
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 388 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 391 Motion in Limine. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (ADB)
|
September 30, 2014 |
Filing
421
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: The plaintiff's motion (Filing No. 270 ) is denied in part and granted in part. Mr. Neal may be called as a live witness but the scope of his testimony is limited to the contents of his deposition, the d ocuments which Syniverse produced to Prism, and his competency during his deposition. The documents which the defendant produced for the first time in response to the plaintiff's expert report concerning Microsoft user data and metrocells are s tricken and excluded. The "profit and loss" spreadsheet that contained the line item "Interconnect/Facilities" is not stricken. The defendant's motion (Filing No. 317 ) to file a sur-reply is granted; the sur-rely is deemed filed. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TCL )
|
September 29, 2014 |
Filing
417
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying (255) Motion to Exclude in case 8:12-cv-00122-LES-TDT; denying (216) Motion to Exclude in case 8:12-cv-00123-LES-TDT; denying (229) Motion to Exclude in case 8:12-cv-00124-LES-TDT; denying (209) Motion to Exclude in case 8:12-cv-00125-LES-TDT; denying (199) Motion to Exclude in case 8:12-cv-00126-LES-TDT. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (ADB, )
|
September 24, 2014 |
Filing
413
ORDER denying as moot 407 motion to strike. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (JDR)
|
September 22, 2014 |
Filing
411
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the defendants' motions (Filing No. 261 in 8:12CV122; Filing No. 221 in 8:12CV123; Filing No. 234 in 8:12CV124; Filing No. 214 in 8:12CV125; Filing No. 204 in 8:12CV126)) are granted. Mr. Malackowski is prohibited from offering his opinion and testimony at trial in its entirety. In light of this order, the Court dismisses AT&T'scase-specific motion (Filing No. 266) against Mr. Malackowski. DATED this 22nd day of September, 2014. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (ADB)
|
September 17, 2014 |
Filing
403
PRETRIAL ORDER - estimated length of trial is 8 - 10 days. Jury Trial set for 10/14/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (KMG)
|
August 19, 2014 |
Filing
378
ORDER denying as moot 376 motion to restrict pursuant to the E-Government Act. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (JDR)
|
August 15, 2014 |
Filing
374
ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the parties may file documents as restricted or sealed, without the necessity of filing a separate motion, subject to the above terms. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TCL )
|
August 12, 2014 |
Filing
360
ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the motion 355 is granted; the documents as enumerated in the motion are filed as restricted pending further order of the Court. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TCL )
|
August 5, 2014 |
Filing
342
ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the motions for leave to file documents as restricted are granted; the documents as enumerated in the motions are filed as restricted pending further order of the Court. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TCL)
|
August 4, 2014 |
Filing
332
ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the motion 316 is granted; the documents as enumerated in the motion are filed as restricted pending further order of the Court. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TCL )
|
July 31, 2014 |
Filing
315
ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the motion is granted 313 ; the documents enumerated in plaintiff's motion are filed as restricted pending further order of the Court. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TCL)
|
July 30, 2014 |
Filing
312
ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the motion is granted 308 ; the documents enumerated in plaintiff's motion are filed as restricted pending further order of the Court. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TCL )
|
July 23, 2014 |
Filing
304
ORDER granting 247 motion for protective order. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (JDR) Modified on 7/23/2014 (JDR) to reflect error in docketing entry.
|
July 22, 2014 |
Filing
297
ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the motion is granted 287 ; the documents enumerated in plaintiff's motion are filed as restricted pending further order of the Court. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TCL )
|
July 16, 2014 |
Filing
278
ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the motion 276 is granted; plaintiff's brief in opposition to defendant's motion for protective order is filed as restricted pending further order of the Court. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TCL )
|
July 10, 2014 |
Filing
275
ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the motions are granted; the documents as enumerated in the respective motions are filed as sealed pending further order of the Court. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TCL )
|
July 7, 2014 |
Filing
251
ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the motion 250 is granted; the documents as enumerated in the motions are filed as restricted pending further order of the Court. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TCL )
|
July 1, 2014 |
Filing
246
ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the motion 241 is granted; the documents as enumerated in the motions are filed as restricted pending further order of the Court. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TCL )
|
May 6, 2014 |
Filing
223
ORDER denying 215 motion for leave to supplement its invalidity contentions. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (JDR)
|
April 21, 2014 |
Filing
214
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: AT&T's motion regarding RFA Nos. 223, 224, 225, 226 and 233 is granted. Plaintiff shall respond to those requests for admission by May 2, 2014. The remainder of AT&T's motion to compel is denied as moot. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TCL )
|
April 16, 2014 |
Filing
212
ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the motion 207 is granted; Exhibit B to its response to AT&T's motion to compel shall be filed as sealed pending further order of the Court. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TCL )
|
April 9, 2014 |
Filing
211
ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: The previous order did not limit the obviousness combinations other than to combinations of those twenty (20) references. The defendants shall elect twenty (20) anticipation references per defendant. The defendants may utilize only those twenty references (20) to compose obviousness combinations. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TCL )
|
March 10, 2014 |
Filing
203
ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the motion 199 is granted; Exhibit C to its brief in support of its motion to compel Prism to provide proper responses to AT&T's requests for admissions shall be filed as sealed pending further order of the Court. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TCL )
|
February 19, 2014 |
Filing
189
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that AT&T's motion to supplement its invalidity contentions is granted. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TCL )
|
October 31, 2013 |
Filing
156
ORDER granting (151) Motion to Restrict pursuant to the E-Government Act in case 8:12-cv-00122-LES-TDT; granting (151) Motion to Restrict pursuant to the E-Government Act in case 8:12-cv-00123-LES-TDT; granting (146) Motion to Restrict pursuant to the E-Government Act in case 8:12-cv-00125-LES-TDT; granting (153) Motion to Restrict pursuant to the E-Government Act in case 8:12-cv-00126-LES-TDT Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (AOA)
|
September 30, 2013 |
Filing
142
ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the motions for leave to file documents as restricted are granted in accordance with plaintiff's respective motions. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TCL )
|
July 30, 2013 |
Filing
132
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: For the purposes of United States Patent Nos. 7,290,288, 8,127,345, and 8,387,155, 1) As jointly stipulated by the parties (Schedule B, Filing No. 110), the following terms are construed as indicated in this Order. 2) As jointly stipulated by the parties (Schedule B, Filing No. 110), the preambles of the asserted claims are limiting. 3) The Court construes disputed terms as set forth within this Order. 4) The Court will not provide a construction for the term "authorization level(s)." Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TCL )
|
July 9, 2013 |
Filing
129
ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the motions are granted; the parties may file the exhibits to supplement the claim construction record as provided in the motions. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TCL )
|
May 30, 2013 |
Filing
123
ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the motions are granted; plaintiff's motions to file Exhibits M and N to its opening brief in support of its constructions are filed as restricted pending further order of the Court. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TCL )
|
February 13, 2013 |
Filing
81
ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: The motions (Filing No. 80 in 8:12CV122, Filing No. 78 in 8:12CV123 and Filing No. 81 in 8:12CV124) to strike are granted. The clerk of court shall strike the specified briefs. Plaintiff shall refile the corrected briefs on or before February 20, 2013. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TCL )
|
January 22, 2013 |
Filing
71
PROTECTIVE ORDER. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TCL )
|
January 8, 2013 |
Filing
67
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the joint motions for protective order governing the disclosure and use of discovery materials (Filing No. 59 in 8:12CV122, Filing No. 58 in 8:12CV123, Filing No. 55 in 8:12CV124, Filing No. 54 in 8:12CV125, and Filing No. 59 in 8:12CV126) are granted to the extent described above. The parties shall submit to the Court an amended Proposed Order incorporating the decisions of this Court as delineated herein by January 15, 2013. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TCL )
|
December 11, 2012 |
Filing
65
ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 1/11/2013 08:15 AM in Chambers before Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TCL )
|
September 6, 2012 |
Filing
39
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - AT&T's motion to dismiss (Filing No. 27 ) is granted, as follows: Prism will file an amended complaint with the Court setting forth adequate infringement allegations on or before September 21, 2012. Should Prism fail to file a timely amended complaint, this action will be dismissed. AT&T's request for oral argument is denied as moot. (Amended Complaint due by 9/21/2012.) Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TEL)
|
July 3, 2012 |
Filing
38
ORDER - The joint motion for enlargement of time to submit parties' planning conference report 37 is granted. The parties shall have fourteen days after the date of defendant's answer to file their Rule 26(f) report after the Court rules on defendant's motion to dismiss. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TEL)
|
June 7, 2012 |
Filing
33
ORDER granting Notice of Voluntary Dismissal 25 - AT&T Inc., is dismissed as a party defendant without prejudice. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TEL)
|