Prism Technologies v. Sprint Spectrum L.P.

Plaintiff: Prism Technologies
Defendant: Sprint Spectrum L.P.
Case Number: 8:2012cv00123
Filed: April 4, 2012
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Lyle E. Strom
Referring Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 3, 2016 604 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 603 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Michael J. Abernathy of the law firm of K&L Gates LLP is deemed withdrawn as counsel for Sprint Spectrum, L.P., d/b/a Sprint PCS. The clerk of court shall remove his name from CM/ECF. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (GJG)
January 4, 2016 592 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Sprint's motion for review of the clerk's taxation of costs, filing 558 , is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (GJG)
December 18, 2015 591 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND JUDGMENT - Prism's motion for prejudgment and postjudgment interest (Filing No. 489 ) is granted. Prejudgment interest shall be applied to the $30 million dollar verdict at a prime rate of 3.25% and compounded quarterly r esulting in the amount of $2,001,923. Postjudgment interest shall be calculated from the date of the entry of judgment using the weekly average 1-year constant maturity Treasury yield compounded annually pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1961. Spr int shall pay Prism $2,001,923 together with postjudgment interest from the date judgment, June 24, 2015, until satisfaction, in accordance with 28 U.S.C. § 1961. Prism's motion for an accounting and ongoing royalties (Filing No. 496 ) is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (GJG)
December 9, 2015 589 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND JUDGMENT - Pursuant to the memorandum opinion entered herein this date, filing 588 , IT IS ORDERED: 1) Defendant's renewed motion for judgment as a matter of law (Filing No. 490 ) is denied. 2) Defendant's motion for new tri al (Filing No. 486 ) is denied. 3) Defendant's motion for relief from judgment pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 60(b), or in the alternative, motion for leave to supplement Sprint's motion for new trial, (Filing No. 576 ) is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (GJG)
October 13, 2015 575 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 574 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Christine A. Guastello is deemed withdrawn as counsel for Sprint Spectrum, L.P., d/b/a Sprint PCS.The clerk of court shall remove her name from CM/ECF. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (JSF)
September 22, 2015 557 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: The parties proposed redactions are adopted. The court reporter shall file the final redacted transcript within twenty-one days of this order. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TCL)
August 31, 2015 542 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting motion, filing 540 . Prism's reply brief in support of its motion for prejudgment and post judgment interest shall be due on or before September 10, 2015. Prism's reply brief in support of its motion for an accounting an d ongoing royalties shall be due on or before September 10, 2015. Sprint's reply in support of its motion for new trial shall be due on or before September 10, 2015. Sprint's reply brief in support of its renewed motion for judgment as a matter of law of no infringement shall be due on or before September 10, 2015. The parties' request for redaction of transcript shall be due on or before August 31, 2015. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (GJG)
July 28, 2015 517 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's motion for attorneys' fees (Filing No. 481 ) is denied. Defendant's motion for oral argument (Filing No. 512 ) is denied as moot. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (GJG )
June 24, 2015 469 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - This matter is before the Court on: 1) Joint stipulation (Filing No. 427 ); 2) Sprint Spectrum's motion to seal courtroom (Filing No. 429 ); 3) Prism Technologies' motion to quash Sprint's trial subpoena to Hussein Enan ( Filing No. 434 ); 4) Sprint Spectrum's motion for judgment as a matter of law of no infringement under Rule 50(a) (Filing No. 445 ); and 5) Prism's motion for judgment as a matter of law pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 50(a) (Filing No. 456 ). The Court has reviewed the matters and notes that the jury returned a verdict in favor of the plaintiff. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED: 1) The joint stipulation of the parties is approved and adopted; 2) The motion to seal the courtroom is denied as moot. 3) The plaintiff's motion (Filing No. 434 ) to quash the trial subpoena of Mr. Hussein Enan is moot as defendant has orally withdrawn its subpoena. 4) Sprint Spectrums motion for judgment as a matter of law of no infringement under Rule 50(a) is denied; and 5) Prisms motion for judgment as a matter of law pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 50(a) is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (GJG )
June 22, 2015 451 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 439 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. William N. Hannah, formerly of the law firm Kramer, Levin, Naftalis & Frankel, LLP, is deemed withdrawn as counsel for United States Cellular Corporation. The clerk of court shall remove his name from CM/ECF. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (GJG)
June 9, 2015 425 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 356 stipulation; denying as moot 378 stipulation; approving and adopting 392 stipulation as if fully set forth herein. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (JDR)
June 8, 2015 417 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - This matter is before the Court on cross motions in limine from both the plaintiff Prism Technologies, L.L.C. (Prism) (Filing No. 357 ) and defendant Sprint Spectrum, doing business as Sprint PCS (Sprint) (Filing No. 361 , Filing No. 362 , Filing No. 363 ). After review of the motions, briefs, indices of evidence, and relevant case law, IT IS ORDERED as set forth is this order. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (GJG)
May 6, 2015 374 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 373 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Michael K.Huffer, David A. Blagg and Carolyn A. Wilson are deemed withdrawn as counsel for Sprint Spectrum L.P., d/b/a Sprint PCS. The clerk of court shall remove their names from CM/ECF. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (GJG)
April 23, 2015 342 Opinion or Order of the Court IT IS ORDERED that oral argument on the motions 336 is scheduled for: Wednesday, May 27, 2015, at 2 p.m. in Courtroom No. 5, Roman L. Hruska United States Courthouse, Omaha, Nebraska. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (GJG)
March 6, 2015 317 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Defendant's motion (Filing No. 309 ) is denied without prejudice. Plaintiff's motion (Filing No. 310 ) is granted. Plaintiff's objection to defendant's motion (Filing No. 316 ) is denied as moot. The parties shall have seven additional days for discovery. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (GJG)
February 9, 2015 287 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - In Docket Number 8:12CV123, the Court grants defendant's request and adopts the following deadlines: Prism shall produce documents by February 13, 2015. Fact depositions shall be completed by February 23, 2015. Mr. Malackowski's d eposition shall be completed by March 13, 2015. The Carrier Defendants may offer a common Daubert motion by April 3, 2015. Prism may respond to that motion by April 17, 2015. The Carrier Defendants may reply to the response brief by April 27, 2015. T he Sprint Matter shall go to trial on June 15, 2015 Jury Trial set for 6/15/2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (GJG)
January 23, 2015 267 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - In Case 8:12CV123, plaintiff's motion (Filing No. 252 ) to supplement its reports is granted and plaintiff's motion (Filing No. 261 ) for a hearing is denied. In Case 8:12CV124, plaintiff's motion (Filing No. 263) to supplem ent its reports is granted and plaintiff's motion (Filing No. 274) for a hearing is denied. In Case 8:12CV125, plaintiff's motion (Filing No. 253) to supplement its reports is granted and plaintiff's motion (Filing No. 260) for a hearing is denied. In Case 8:12CV126, plaintiff's motion (Filing No. 235) to supplement its reports is granted and plaintiff's motion (Filing No. 244) for a hearing is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (GJG)
December 23, 2014 258 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting filing 257 . The respective motions are granted. Plaintiff shall have until January 9, 2015, to file its reply brief in further support of its motion to supplement expert reports. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (GJG)
December 11, 2014 256 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the respective motions are granted. The defendants shall have until December 23, 2014, to respond to Prism's motion for leave to serve supplemental and/or expert reports. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TCL)
November 20, 2014 251 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 250 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Amy M. Locher is deemed withdrawn as counsel for Sprint Spectrum L.P., d/b/a Sprint PCS. The clerk of court shall remove her name from CM/ECF. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (GJG)
August 15, 2014 242 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - The motions 234 and 238 for leave to file documents under seal are granted; the documents as enumerated in the motions are filed under seal pending further order of the Court. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (GJG)
May 23, 2014 210 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Attorney B. Trent Webb has a pending case in this court and has not paid the 2013/2014 Attorney Assessment. Within 30 days from the date of this order, Attorney B. Trent Webb is directed to pay the $20.00 fee or show cause why he is unable to do so. Show Cause Deadline set for 6/23/2014. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (BMH)
May 16, 2014 209 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Plaintiff's motion, filing 196 is denied in part and granted in part as set forth above. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (GJG)
March 12, 2014 185 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Motions to Withdraw as Attorney filing 183 and 184 . Alfred F. Harris is deemed withdrawn as counsel for Sprint Spectrum L.P., d/b/a Sprint PCS. The clerk of court shall remove his name from CM/ECF. Jonathan N. Zerger is deemed withdrawn as counsel for Sprint Spectrum L.P., d/b/a Sprint PCS. The clerk of court shall remove his name from CM/ECF. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (GJG)
December 4, 2012 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 56 Motion to Extend. Defendant shall have until December 10, 2012, in which to respond to plaintiff's MOTION for Protective Order Governing The Disclosure And Use Of Discovery Materials 46 . Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (ADB, )
November 28, 2012 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 52 Motion to Extend. Defendant shall have until December 3, 2012, in which to respond to plaintiff's motion for protective order. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (GJG)
September 6, 2012 35 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Sprint's motion to dismiss (Filing No. 23 ) is granted, as follows: 1) Prism will file an amended complaint with the Court setting forth adequate infringement allegations on or before September 21, 2012; 2) Should Prism fail to file a timely amended complaint, this action will be dismissed. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (GJG)
July 3, 2012 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - The joint motion for enlargement of time to submit parties' planning conference report 32 is granted. The parties shall have fourteen days after the date of defendant's answer to file their Rule 26(f) report after the Court rules on defendant's motion to dismiss. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prism Technologies v. Sprint Spectrum L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prism Technologies
Represented By: Paul Andre
Represented By: Mark A. Baghdassarian
Represented By: Andre J. Bahou
Represented By: Jonathan S. Caplan
Represented By: Marcus A. Colucci
Represented By: Michael C. Cox
Represented By: Daniel J. Fischer
Represented By: Lisa Kobialka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sprint Spectrum L.P.
Represented By: Michael K. Huffer
Represented By: Amy M. Locher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?