Prism Technologies v. T-Mobile USA, Inc.

Plaintiff: Prism Technologies
Defendant: T-Mobile USA, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2012cv00124
Filed: April 4, 2012
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Lyle E. Strom
Referring Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 6, 2016 674 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND JUDGMENT - Prism's renewed motion for judgment as a matter oflaw (Filing No. 634 ) is denied. T-Mobile's renewed motion for judgment as a matter of law (Filing No. 614 ) is denied. Prism's motion for new trial (Filing No. 609 ) is denied. T-Mobile's motion for attorney fees (Filing No. 622 ) is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (LAC)
March 3, 2016 672 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER NUNC PRO TUNC that the motion is granted. Michael J. Abernathy and Brian J. Arnold of the law firm of K&L Gates LLP are deemed withdrawn as counsel for T-Mobile USA, Inc. The clerk of court shall remove their names from CM/ECF. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (LAC)
February 25, 2016 664 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the court reporter shall make the above mentioned redactions 10 days after the filing of this order. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (LAC)
November 16, 2015 588 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the motion for extension (Filing No. 586 ) is denied as moot. The amended motion for extension (Filing No. 587 ) is granted; plaintiff shall have until December 4, 2015, to file its brief and evidence in opposition to T-Mobile's motion for judgment as a matter of law. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (LAC)
October 28, 2015 562 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that all Rule 50 motions shall be filed electroncially by noon on October 28, 2015. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (JDR)
October 26, 2015 542 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Prism's motion to strike Filing No.504 is granted. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (LAC)
October 20, 2015 502 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on T-Mobile's objections to demonstratives to be used during the direct examination of James E. Malackowski. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (JDR)
October 8, 2015 482 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the Plaintiff's motion (Filing No. 355 ) to strike defendant's untimely document production is denied. Plaintiff's motion (Filing No. 355 ) to strike defendant's non-infringing alternative theories is g ranted. Plaintiff's motion (Filing No. 369 ) to exclude the expert testimony of T-Mobile's damages expert W. Christopher Bakewell is denied. However, Bakewell may not present testimony regarding non-infringing alternatives. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (LAC)
October 5, 2015 462 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - This matter is before the Court on cross motions in limine from both the plaintiff Prism Technologies, LLC (Prism)(Filing No. 358 ) and defendant T-Mobile USA, Inc. (TMobile)(Filing No. 362 ). After review of the motions, briefs, indices of evidence, and relevant case law, IT IS ORDERED as set forth in this order. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (LAC)
October 2, 2015 457 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER pursuant to 10/1/15 phone conference, trial remains scheduled for October 13, 2015, at 9:00 a.m. The witness Ms. Kirti Krishnan shall be deposed unless the parties agree that the previous deposition testimony of the 30(b)(6) witness is binding. Mr. Cameron Byrne is stricken as a witness and shall not be deposed. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (CCB)
September 29, 2015 450 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 387 motion to exclude the testimony of John B. Minor. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (JDR)
September 28, 2015 447 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Prism's 335 Motion to Strike T-Mobile's second supplemental initial disclosures is granted in part and denied in part. Prism's motion to strike the disclosure of potential trial witness Cameron Byrne is granted. Prism's motion to strike the disclosure of potential trial witness Kirti Krishnan is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (LAC)
September 8, 2015 395 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 312 motion for leave to serve a supplemental expert report. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (JDR)
June 22, 2015 308 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 307 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. William N.Hannah, formerly of the law firm Kramer, Levin, Naftalis & Frankel, LLP, is deemed withdrawn as counsel for United States Cellular Corporation. The clerk of court shall remove his name from CM/ECF. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (GJG)
June 8, 2015 306 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - In Case Number 8:12CV123, the defendant's motion (Filing No. 336) to exclude the testimony of Mr. Malackowski is denied. In Case Number 8:12CV124, the defendant's motion (Filing No. 290 ) to exclude the testimony of Mr. Malackowski is denied. In Case Number 8:12CV125, the defendant's motion (Filing No. 279) to exclude the testimony of Mr. Malackowski isdenied. In Case Number 8:12CV126, the defendant's motion(Filing No. 261) to exclude the testimony of Mr. Malackowski is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (GJG, )
April 23, 2015 295 Opinion or Order of the Court IT IS ORDERED that oral argument on the motions 290 is scheduled for: Wednesday, May 27, 2015, at 2 p.m. in Courtroom No. 5, Roman L. Hruska United States Courthouse, Omaha, Nebraska. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (GJG)
February 9, 2015 279 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - In Docket Number 8:12CV124, the Court grants defendant's request and the T-Mobile Matter shall go to trial on October 13, 2015. Jury Trial set for 10/13/2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (GJG)
January 23, 2015 278 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - In Case 8:12CV123, plaintiff's motion (Filing No. 252) to supplement its reports is granted and plaintiff's motion (Filing No. 261) for a hearing is denied. In Case 8:12CV124, plaintiff's motion (Filing No. 263 ) to supplemen t its reports is granted and plaintiff's motion (Filing No. 274 ) for a hearing is denied. In Case 8:12CV125, plaintiff's motion (Filing No. 253) to supplement its reports is granted and plaintiff's motion (Filing No. 260) for a hearing is denied. In Case 8:12CV126, plaintiff's motion (Filing No. 235) to supplement its reports is granted and plaintiff's motion (Filing No. 244) for a hearing is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (GJG)
December 23, 2014 271 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 270 Motion to Extend. The respective motions are granted. Plaintiff shall have until January 9, 2015, to file its reply brief in further support of its motion to supplement expert reports. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (GJG)
August 15, 2014 255 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - The motions 247 and 251 for leave to file documents under seal are granted; the documents as enumerated in the motions are filed under seal pending further order of the Court. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (GJG)
March 31, 2014 219 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 218 Motion to Extend. The parties shall have until April 11, 2014, to present their opening expert reports. The parties shall have until May 23, 2014, to present their rebuttal expert reports. The close of discovery is extended to June 13, 2014. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (JSF)
October 15, 2013 154 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting plaintiff's motion to withdraw 153 . Plaintiff's motion 147 , the related brief 148 and the index of evidence 149 are deemed withdrawn without prejudice. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (JSF)
December 4, 2012 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 53 Motion to Extend. Defendant shall have until December 10, 2012, in which to respond to plaintiff's 44 Motion for Protective Order. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (ADB, )
November 28, 2012 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 49 Motion to Extend. Defendant shall have until December 3, 2012, in which to respond to plaintiff's 44 Motion for Protective Order. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (ADB)
July 3, 2012 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 32 Motion to Extend. The parties shall have fourteen days after the date of defendant's answer to file their Rule 26(f) report after the Court rules on defendant's motion to dismiss. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (ADB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prism Technologies v. T-Mobile USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prism Technologies
Represented By: Paul Andre
Represented By: Mark A. Baghdassarian
Represented By: Andre J. Bahou
Represented By: Jonathan S. Caplan
Represented By: Marcus A. Colucci
Represented By: Michael C. Cox
Represented By: Daniel J. Fischer
Represented By: Lisa Kobialka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T-Mobile USA, Inc.
Represented By: Carrie S. Dolton
Represented By: Michael T. Hilgers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?