July 18, 2019 |
Filing
369
ORDER - that these actions are dismissed, with prejudice, the parties to bear their own costs. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (LKO)
|
June 25, 2019 |
Filing
365
ORDER - Within two weeks of the date of this order, plaintiff Prism Technologies LLC Inc. shall show cause why these actions should not be dismissed. Defendants shall respond thereto, if necessary, within one week thereafter. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (LKO)
|
June 14, 2019 |
Filing
364
ORDER - that the motions requesting the withdrawal of Carolyn A. Wilson, formerly of the law firm Cassem, Tierney, Adams, Gotch & Douglas, and Jessica Johnson Fishfeld of Sidley Austin LLP, as counsel of record for Defendant, (Filing Nos. 362 and 363 ), are granted. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LKO)
|
January 24, 2019 |
Filing
361
ORDER - that the motion to withdraw Andr J. Bahou, Matthew W. Olinzock, and Aakash B. Jariwala as counsel of record for Plaintiff, Prism Technologies, LLC., (Filing No. 360 ), is granted. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LKO)
|
June 1, 2018 |
Filing
359
ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the parties' pending motions (Filing Nos. 306, 307, 308, 314, 315, 316, 321, 327, and 345) are denied without prejudice to reassertion. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (TCL)
|
January 25, 2017 |
Filing
355
ORDER - The motion 354 is granted. Robert D. Leighton and Ryan N. Phelan of the law firm of Sidley Austin, LLP, are deemed withdrawn as counsel for United States Cellular Corporation. The clerk of court shall remove their names from CM/ECF. This order shall in no way affect the order granting defendant's motion to stay (Filing No. 349 ) which shall remain in full force and effect. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (KLF)
|
June 22, 2015 |
Filing
297
ORDER granting 296 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. William N. Hannah, formerly of the law firm Kramer, Levin, Naftalis & Frankel, LLP, is deemed withdrawn as counsel for United States Cellular Corporation. The clerk of court shall remove his name from CM/ECF. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (GJG)
|
June 8, 2015 |
Filing
295
ORDER - In Case Number 8:12CV123, the defendant's motion (Filing No. 336) to exclude the testimony of Mr. Malackowski is denied. In Case Number 8:12CV124, the defendant's motion (Filing No. 290) to exclude the testimony of Mr. Malackowski i s denied. In Case Number 8:12CV125, the defendant's motion (Filing No. 279 ) to exclude the testimony of Mr. Malackowski is denied. In Case Number 8:12CV126, the defendant's motion(Filing No. 261) to exclude the testimony of Mr. Malackowski is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (GJG)
|
April 23, 2015 |
Filing
284
IT IS ORDERED that oral argument on the motions 279 is scheduled for: Wednesday, May 27, 2015, at 2 p.m. in Courtroom No. 5, Roman L. Hruska United States Courthouse, Omaha, Nebraska. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (GJG)
|
February 9, 2015 |
Filing
267
ORDER - In Docket Number 8:12CV125, the Court grants defendant's request and the U.S. Cellular Matter shall go to trial on November 9, 2015. Jury Trial set for 11/9/2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (GJG)
|
January 23, 2015 |
Filing
266
ORDER - In Case 8:12CV123, plaintiff's motion (Filing No. 252) to supplement its reports is granted and plaintiff's motion (Filing No. 261) for a hearing is denied. In Case 8:12CV124, plaintiff's motion (Filing No. 263) to supplement its reports is granted and plaintiff's motion (Filing No. 274) for a hearing is denied. In Case 8:12CV125, plaintiff's motion (Filing No. 253 ) to supplement its reports is granted and plaintiff's motion (Filing No. 260 ) for a hearing is denied. In Case 8:12CV126, plaintiff's motion (Filing No. 235) to supplement its reports is granted and plaintiff's motion (Filing No. 244) for a hearing is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (GJG, )
|
January 5, 2015 |
Filing
262
ORDER denying 253 motion to compel mandatory, non-binding mediation. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (JDR)
|
December 23, 2014 |
Filing
257
ORDER granting 256 Motion to Extend. The respective motions are granted. Plaintiff shall have until January 9, 2015, to file its reply brief in further support of its motion to supplement expert reports. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (GJG)
|
December 10, 2014 |
Filing
250
ORDER granting 249 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Richard J. O'Brien of the law firm of Sidley Austin, LLP, is deemed withdrawn as counsel for United States Cellular Corporation. The clerk of court shall remove his name from CM/ECF. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (MKR)
|
November 20, 2014 |
Filing
244
ORDER granting defendant's 243 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Amy M. Locher is deemed withdrawn as counsel for United States Cellular Corporation. The clerk of court shall remove her name from CM/ECF. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (MKR )
|
August 15, 2014 |
Filing
235
ORDER - The motions 227 and 231 for leave to file documents under seal are granted; the documents as enumerated in the motions are filed under seal pending further order of the Court. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (GJG)
|
May 2, 2014 |
Filing
203
STIPULATION AND ORDER - Prism's Motion to Compel (ECF No. 197 ) is withdrawn. Prism shall supplement its expert reports based upon U.S. Cellular's e-mail production by May 22, 2014. U.S. Cellular shall respond to Prisms supplementation by June 6, 2014. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (AOA)
|
April 24, 2014 |
Filing
201
ORDER granting the defendant's 200 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. James I. Zirkle of the law firm of Sidley Austin, LLP, is deemed withdrawn as counsel of record for defendant. His name shall be removed from CM/ECF and he will no longer receive notice of fiings in this case. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (MKR)
|
January 13, 2014 |
Filing
174
ORDER granting the defendant's 173 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Savan N. Vaghani of the law firm of Sidley Austin, LLP, is deemed withdrawn as counsel of record for defendant. His name shall be removed from CM/ECF and he shall no longer receive notice of filings in this case. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (MKR)
|
December 27, 2013 |
Filing
170
ORDER granting the defendant's 168 Motion to Extend. Defendant shall have until January 9, 2014, in which to produce certain documents to comply with the Court's order of December 18, 2013. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (MKR)
|
December 18, 2013 |
Filing
166
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - U.S. Cellular will produce the following RFPs within ten business days: 1, 2, 3, 11, 12, 16, 19, 20, 28, 37, 38, 39, 40, 41, 42, 55, 59, 60, 62, 63, 79, 96. U.S. Cellular will set a date certain when the following RFPs will be delivered to Prism: 22, 23, 24, 26, 27, 30, 32, 33, 34. The Court will wait to rule on these RFPs. The following RFCs are also denied without prejudice a this time: 13 and 66. Prism has five business days from the filing of this order to su pplement its original RFPs. U.S. Cellular has five business days to produce those requested documents after the request is made. The following RFPs are denied without prejudice: 56, 88, 25, 29, 31. On or before January 17, 2014, the parties shall meet and confer in good faith to "identify the proper custodians, search terms, and proper time frame" in order for Prism to create specific production requests according to the e-discovery order. Then, Prism will request production of specific discovery within ten business days of the parties' meet and confer. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (MKR)
|
February 6, 2013 |
Filing
71
ORDER granting Defendant's 70 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. William M. Chang of the law firm of Sidley Austin, LLP, is deemed withdrawn as counsel of record for defendant. His name shall be removed from CM/ECF and he shall no longer receive notice of filings in this case. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (MKR)
|
December 4, 2012 |
Filing
53
ORDER granting the Defendant's 52 Motion to Extend. Defendant shall have until December 10, 2012, in which to respond to plaintiff's motion for protective order. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (MKR)
|
November 28, 2012 |
Filing
49
ORDER granting the defendant's 48 Motion to Extend. Defendant shall have until December 3, 2012, in which to respond to plaintiff's motion for protective order. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (MKR)
|
September 6, 2012 |
Filing
33
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - U.S. Cellular's motion to dismiss (Filing No. 27 ) is granted, as follows: 1) Prism will file an amended complaint with the Court setting forth adequate infringement allegations on or before September 21, 2012; 2) Should Prism fail to file a timely amended complaint, this action will be dismissed. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (GJG)
|
July 3, 2012 |
Filing
31
ORDER granting the parties Joint 30 Motion for enlargement of time to submit the parties' planning conference. The parties shall have fourteen days after the date of the defendant's answer to file their Rule 26(f) report after the Court rules on defendant's motion to dismiss. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (MKR)
|