Prism Technologies v. Cellco Partnership et al
Plaintiff: Prism Technologies
Defendant: Cellco Partnership and Verizon Communications, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2012cv00126
Filed: April 4, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Lyle E. Strom
Presiding Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 303 ORDER - that these actions are dismissed, with prejudice, the parties tobear their own costs. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (LKO)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 299 ORDER - Within two weeks of the date of this order, plaintiff Prism Technologies LLC Inc. shall show cause why these actions should not be dismissed. Defendants shall respond thereto, if necessary, within one week thereafter. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (LKO)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 298 ORDER granting 296 and 297 Motions to Withdraw as Attorney. Carolyn A. Wilson, formerly of the law firm Cassem, Tierney, Adams, Gotch & Douglas, is withdrawn as counsel of record. Joseph C. Masullo and Kurt A. Mathas, of the law firm Winston & Strawn, are withdrawn as counsel of record. ECF notifications to the foregoing withdrawn attorneys shall be discontinued. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 294 ORDER that the motion to withdraw Andr J. Bahou, Matthew W. Olinzock, and Aakash B. Jariwala as counsel of record for Plaintiff, Prism Technologies, LLC., (Filing No. 293 ), is granted. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LAC)
July 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 288 ORDER granting defendant's 287 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Charles B. Molster, III, formerly of the law firm of Winston & Strawn is deemed withdrawn as counsel for Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless. The Clerk of Court shall remove his name from CM/ECF. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (MKR)
June 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 279 ORDER granting 278 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. William N. Hannah, formerly of the law firm Kramer, Levin, Naftalis & Frankel, LLP, is deemed withdrawn as counsel for United States Cellular Corporation. The clerk of court shall remove his name from CM/ECF. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (GJG)
June 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 277 ORDER - In Case Number 8:12CV123, the defendant's motion (Filing No. 336 ) to exclude the testimony of Mr. Malackowski is denied. In Case Number 8:12CV124, the defendant's motion (Filing No. 290) to exclude the testimony of Mr. Malackowski is denied. In Case Number 8:12CV125, the defendant's motion (Filing No. 279) to exclude the testimony of Mr. Malackowski is denied. In Case Number 8:12CV126, the defendant's motion(Filing No. 261 ) to exclude the testimony of Mr. Malackowski is denied.Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (GJG)
April 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 265 IT IS ORDERED that oral argument on the motions 261 is scheduled for: Wednesday, May 27, 2015, at 2 p.m. in Courtroom No. 5, Roman L. Hruska United States Courthouse, Omaha, Nebraska. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (GJG)
February 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 249 ORDER - In Docket Number 8:12CV126, the Court grants the defendant's request and the Verizon Matter shall go to trial on a date to be determined. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (GJG)
January 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORDER - In Case 8:12CV123, plaintiff's motion (Filing No. 252) to supplement its reports is granted and plaintiff's motion (Filing No. 261) for a hearing is denied. In Case 8:12CV124, plaintiff's motion (Filing No. 263) to supplement its reports is granted and plaintiff's motion (Filing No. 274) for a hearing is denied. In Case 8:12CV125, plaintiff's motion (Filing No. 253) to supplement its reports is granted and plaintiff's motion (Filing No. 260) for a hearing is denied. In Case 8:12CV126, plaintiff's motion (Filing No. 235 ) to supplement its reports is granted and plaintiff's motion (Filing No. 244 ) for a hearing is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (GJG, )
December 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER granting 240 Motion to Extend. The respective motions are granted.Plaintiff shall have until January 9, 2015, to file its reply brief in further support of its motion to supplement expert reports. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (GJG)
November 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ORDER granting the 233 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Amy M. Locher is deemed withdrawn as counsel for Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless. The Clerk of court shall remove her name from CM/ECF. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (MKR)
August 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER - The motions 217 and 221 for leave to file documents under seal are granted; the documents as enumerated in the motions are filed under seal pending further order of the Court. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (GJG)
October 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER NUNC PRO TUNC- granting the defendant's motion to Strike 148 . The Clerk of court shall strike filing 143 and 145 . Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (MKR).
March 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER granting Defendant's 95 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Andrew R. Sommer of the law firm of Winston & Strawn, LLP, is deemed withdrawn as counsel of record for defendant. His name shall be removed from CM/ECF and he shall no longer receive notice of filings in this case. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (MKR)
December 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting the defendant's 57 Motion to Extend. Defendant shall have until December 10, 2012, in which to respond to plaintiff's motion for protective order. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (MKR)
November 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting 53 Motion to Extend. Defendant shall have until December 3, 2012, in which to respond to plaintiff's motion for protective order. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (MKR)
September 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Verizon Wireless' motion to dismiss (Filing No. 27 ) is granted, as follows: Prism will file an amended complaint with the Court setting forth adequate infringement allegations on or before September 21, 2012. Should Prism fail to file a timely amended complaint, this action will be dismissed. (Amended Complaint due by 9/21/2012.) Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TEL)
July 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the motion is granted. The parties shall have fourteen days after the date of defendant's answer to file their Rule 26(f) report after the Court rules on defendant's motion to dismiss. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TCL )
June 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting 32 Motion to Dismiss Party - Verizon Communications, Inc., is dismissed as a party defendant without prejudice. (Party Verizon Communications Inc. terminated.) Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TEL)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prism Technologies v. Cellco Partnership et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cellco Partnership
Represented By: Michael K. Huffer
Represented By: Amy M. Locher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verizon Communications, Inc.
Represented By: Michael K. Huffer
Represented By: Amy M. Locher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prism Technologies
Represented By: Paul Andre
Represented By: Mark A. Baghdassarian
Represented By: Andre J. Bahou
Represented By: Jonathan S. Caplan
Represented By: Marcus A. Colucci
Represented By: Michael C. Cox
Represented By: Daniel J. Fischer
Represented By: Lisa Kobialka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?