Camacho-Corona v. Douglas County Department of Corrections et al
Plaintiff: Pedro Camacho-Corona
Defendant: U.S. Marshals' Service, Nebraska Medical Center, Federal Bureau of Prisons and Douglas County Department of Corrections
Case Number: 8:2012cv00132
Filed: April 13, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: Lyle E. Strom
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM OPINION - The Court has dismissed the claims against the USM, Douglas County, and the Nebraska Medical Center because plaintiff has failed to state a claim upon which relief may be granted against these defendants. The Court will dismiss plaintiff's claims against the Federal Bureau of Prisons without prejudice to reassertion in the appropriate forum. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (TEL)
June 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Filing No. 6 ) is granted. Plaintiff shall pay an initial partial filing fee of $47.36 by July 2, 2012, unless an enlargement of time is granted in res ponse to a written motion. If the initial partial filing fee is not received by the specified deadline, this case will be dismissed. After payment of the initial partial filing fee, plaintiff's institution shall collect the additional monthl y payments in the manner set forth in 28 U.S.C. § 1915(b)(2), quoted above, and shall forward those installments to the Court. Plaintiff shall keep the Court informed of his current address at all times, and all parties are bound by the F ederal Rules of Civil Procedure and by the Court's Local Rules while this case is pending. Plaintiff shall review the "Notice Regarding Summons Forms" attached to this Order. (Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 7/2/2012: Initial partial filing fee due.) Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (Copy mailed to Federal Bureau of Prisons, National Lockbox, P.O. Box 474701, Des Monies, IA 50947-0001) (Copy mailed to USP-VICTORVILLE, P.O. Box 5300, Adelanto, CA 92301) (TEL)
April 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the plaintiff shall pay the $350.00 filing fee or file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis by 5/29/12. Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 5/29/2012: check for MIFP or payment. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed to pro se party with Form AO240)(ADB, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Camacho-Corona v. Douglas County Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Marshals' Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nebraska Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Prisons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas County Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pedro Camacho-Corona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?