United States of America v Wakan Vision Inc
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Wakan Vision and Wakan Senior Vision Services
Case Number: 8:2012cv00276
Filed: August 7, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: John M Gerrard
Referring Judge: Cheryl R Zwart
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2013 Remark - Public: This case has been dismissed pursuant to the filing of a Notice of Case Dismissal. (TCL )
January 14, 2013 Filing 6 NOTICE of Case Dismissal by Attorney Michael R. Pahl on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America (Pahl, Michael)
December 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER More than 120 days have passed since plaintiff filed its complaint, and plaintiff has not filed proof of service. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m), plaintiff must serve defendant on or before January 15, 2013, or this case will be dismissed without prejudice. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (AJC, )
August 22, 2012 Filing 4 APPLICATION/ORDER admitting for full-time admission Attorney Michael R. Pahl for Plaintiff United States of America. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (MKR)
August 8, 2012 Filing 3 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Michael R. Pahl has not registered for admittance to practice. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (MKR)
August 7, 2012 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge John M. Gerrard and Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. (SLP)
August 7, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Wakan Vision, by Attorney Michael R. Pahl on behalf of United States(Pahl, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v Wakan Vision Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wakan Vision
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wakan Senior Vision Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Michael R. Pahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?