Matulka v. Pinnacle Financial Corporation et al
Plaintiff: |
Michael J. Matulka |
Defendant: |
Eric H. Lindquist, Mortage Electronic Registration Systems, Pinnacle Financial Corporation, Wells Fargo Bank and Eric H. Lindquist, P.C., L.L.O. |
Inclusive: |
Does 1 through 10 |
Case Number: |
8:2012cv00290 |
Filed: |
August 15, 2012 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nebraska |
Office: |
8 Omaha Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Pro Se Docket |
Presiding Judge: |
Richard G. Kopf |
Nature of Suit: |
Real Property: Foreclosure |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1471 Declaratory & Injunctive Relief - Foreclo |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 9, 2013 |
Filing
22
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The Magistrate Judge's findings and recommendation (filing 21 ) are adopted and all claims brought by Michael J. Matulka against Pinnacle Financial Corporation and Does 1 through 10 (inclusive) are dismissed for want of prosecution. Judgment will be entered by separate document. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy sent to pro se party) (AOA) Modified on 9/9/2013 to indicate that copy of order was sent to the pro se party (AOA).
|
April 18, 2013 |
Filing
19
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's claims against Lindquist and Lender Defendants are dismissed with prejudice. Defendants' Motions to Dismiss (Filing Nos. 9 and 18 -1) are granted to the extent they are consistent with this Memorandum and Order. The Clerk of the court is directed to update the court's records in this matter to reflect that Wells Fargo Bank is actually Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, as Trustee for Certificate Holders of Bear Stearns Asset Backed S ecurities I LLC, Asset Backed Certificates, Series 2007-AC5. Plaintiff shall have until May 17, 2013, to show cause why this case should not be dismissed in its entirety for his failure to effect service of process on Pinnacle and Doe Defendants. If Plaintiff does not respond, or if good cause is not shown, this action will be dismissed without prejudice and without further notice. The clerk's office is directed to set a pro se case management deadline with the following text: May 17, 2013: deadline for Plaintiff to show cause why service of process was not completed and Does were not identified. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(AOA)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?