Polk v. Chase Home Finance, LLC
Plaintiff: Andre C. Polk
Defendant: Chase Home Finance, LLC
Case Number: 8:2012cv00339
Filed: September 21, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Thomas D Thalken
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 12 U.S.C. ยง 1461
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED the Joint Stipulation to Dismiss with Prejudice (Filing No. #29 ) is granted. The above-entitled cause is dismissed, with prejudice, and each party shall pay their own costs. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TCL )
November 12, 2013 Filing 29 Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice by Attorney Joshua C. Dickinson on behalf of Defendant Chase Home Finance, LLC.(Dickinson, Joshua)
October 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 TEXT ORDER granting #26 Joint Motion for Extension of Filing Deadline. The parties shall have an extension of time until October 31, 2013, to file documents to complete settlement and dispose of this case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TRL)
October 1, 2013 Filing 27 Mail Returned as Undeliverable addressed to amcshane@legalaidofnebraska.com regarding Joint MOTION to Extend Filing Deadline #26 . E-mail not resent, the attorney no longer works for Legal Aid of Nebraska. (TCL )
October 1, 2013 Filing 26 Joint MOTION to Extend Filing Deadline by Attorney Shirley Peng on behalf of Plaintiff Andre C. Polk.(Peng, Shirley)
August 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 TEXT ORDER granting #24 Joint Motion for Extension of Filing Deadline. The parties shall have an extension of time until September 30, 2013, to file documents to complete settlement and dispose of this case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TRL)
August 1, 2013 Filing 24 Joint MOTION to Extend Time to File Stipulation of Dismissal by Attorney Joshua C. Dickinson on behalf of Defendant Chase Home Finance, LLC.(Dickinson, Joshua)
July 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that: On or before August 1, 2013, the parties shall electronically file a joint stipulation for dismissal (or other dispositive stipulation) and shall submit to the undersigned judge, at thalken@ned.uscourts.gov, a draft order which will fully dispose of the case. If the case is being dismissed, the stipulation shall comply with Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a) and shall state whether the dismissal is with or without prejudice. Absent compliance with this order, this case (including all counterclaims and the like) may be dismissed without further notice. The previously scheduled planning conference is cancelled upon the representation that this case is settled. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TCL )
May 23, 2013 Filing 22 Certificate of Service (Defendant's initial disclosures) by Attorney Joshua C. Dickinson on behalf of Defendant Chase Home Finance, LLC.(Dickinson, Joshua)
May 9, 2013 Filing 21 DISCLOSURE Rule 26(a)(1) by Attorney Shirley Peng on behalf of Plaintiff Andre C. Polk.(Peng, Shirley)
March 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULE FOR INITIAL PROGRESSION OF A CIVIL CASE - Counsel for plaintiff shall initiate the planning conference call to the court at 10:00 a.m. on August 7, 2013. Counsel shall notify the undersigned magistrate judge by joint or separate letters by July 1, 2013 addressing mediation requirements. Planning Conference set for 8/7/2013 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TCL )
March 15, 2013 Filing 19 TEXT ORDER: Pursuant to General Order 2010-11 the parties voluntarily consent to reassignment to the referral magistrate judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken for final disposition. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (TCL )
March 14, 2013 Filing 18 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting - Settlement Likely by Attorney Shirley Peng on behalf of Plaintiff Andre C. Polk.(Peng, Shirley)
February 12, 2013 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Shirley Peng on behalf of Plaintiff Andre C. Polk. (TCL )
January 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER granting #15 Joint Motion for Second Extension of Filing Deadline. The parties shall have an extension until March 14, 2013, to meet, confer, and report to the court pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TRL)
January 15, 2013 Filing 15 Joint MOTION to Extend Filing Deadline by Attorney Joshua C. Dickinson on behalf of Defendant Chase Home Finance, LLC.(Dickinson, Joshua)
November 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER granting #13 Motion to Extend. The parties shall have an extension until January 14, 2013, to meet, confer, and report to the court pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TRL)
November 16, 2012 Filing 13 Joint MOTION to Extend Filing Deadline by Attorney Joshua C. Dickinson on behalf of Defendant Chase Home Finance, LLC.(Dickinson, Joshua)
October 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING LETTER setting Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline for November 15, 2012. Please use the "Form 35 (Rule 26(f)) Report" posted on the court's website, www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TRL)
October 19, 2012 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Other Affiliate JPMorgan Chase & Co., Other Affiliate JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. for Chase Home Finance, LLC. by Attorney Joshua C. Dickinson on behalf of Defendants Chase Home Finance, LLC, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., JPMorgan Chase & Co..(Dickinson, Joshua)
October 19, 2012 Filing 10 ANSWER to Amended Complaint #4 by Attorney Joshua C. Dickinson on behalf of Defendant Chase Home Finance, LLC(Dickinson, Joshua)
September 27, 2012 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Chase Home Finance, LLC on 9/27/2012. (McShane, Anne)
September 21, 2012 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Chase Home Finance, LLC on 9/21/2012. (McShane, Anne)
September 21, 2012 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to defendant Chase Home Finance, LLC. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (TCL )
September 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: The plaintiff's Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Filing No. #2 ) is granted; accordingly, the plaintiff shall be allowed to proceed without payment of the filing fee. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TCL )
September 21, 2012 Filing 5 Summons Requested as to Chase Home Finance LLC regarding Amended Complaint #4 . (McShane, Anne)
September 21, 2012 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Chase Home Finance, LLC, by Attorney Anne C. McShane on behalf of Andre C. Polk (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(McShane, Anne)
September 21, 2012 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Joseph F. Bataillon and Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken assigned. (TCL )
September 21, 2012 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Attorney Anne C. McShane on behalf of Plaintiff Andre C. Polk.(McShane, Anne)
September 21, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Chase Home Finance, LLC, by Attorney Anne C. McShane on behalf of Andre C. Polk(McShane, Anne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Polk v. Chase Home Finance, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andre C. Polk
Represented By: Anne C. McShane
Represented By: Shirley Peng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Home Finance, LLC
Represented By: Joshua C. Dickinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?