Simmons v. Connealy et al
Plaintiff: Robin Simmons
Defendant: William Koepke, Law Office of Crary & Huff, Matthew J. Connealy, Petoy Dohrman, Ida Hingst and Keith Koepke
Case Number: 8:2012cv00365
Filed: October 12, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: Warren K. Urbom
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - This matter is dismissed without prejudice because the plaintiff, Robin Simmons, failed to prosecute this matter diligently and failed to comply with my orders. A separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this memorandum and order. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (AOA)
December 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Simmons shall have on or before December 26, 2012, to amend her Complaint and clearly state a claim upon which relief may be granted against the defendants in accordance with this memorandum and order. If Simmons fails to file an amended complaint, Simmons claims against the defendants will be dismissed without further notice for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. In the event that Simmons files an amended complaint, Simmons shall restat e the allegations of the current Complaint (filing no. 1 ) and any new allegations. Failure to consolidate all claims into one document may result in the abandonment of claims. Simmons shall keep the court informed of her current address at all t imes while this case is pending. Failure to do so may result in dismissal without further notice. ***Pro Se Case Management Deadlines: ( Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 12/26/2012: Check for amended complaint on December 26, 2012.) Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
October 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER provisionally granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The complaint shall be filed without payment of fees. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simmons v. Connealy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Koepke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Law Office of Crary & Huff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew J. Connealy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Petoy Dohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ida Hingst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Koepke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?