Balvin v. Britten
Petitioner: |
Sonny D. Balvin |
Respondent: |
Fred Britten |
Interested Party: |
Nebraska Attorney General |
Case Number: |
8:2012cv00377 |
Filed: |
October 24, 2012 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nebraska |
Office: |
8 Omaha Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Joseph F. Bataillon |
Presiding Judge: |
Pro Se Docket |
Nature of Suit: |
Habeas Corpus: General |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
November 1, 2013 |
Filing
27
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Petitioner's Motion for Leave to Appeal IFP (filing no. 26 ) is granted. The Clerk of the court shall provide the Court of Appeals a copy of this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copies sent as directed and mailed to pro se party) (AOA)
|
October 9, 2013 |
Filing
25
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Petitioner shall have until November 7, 2013, to either pay the $455.00 appellate filing fee or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis in accordance with Fed. R. App. P. 24. 2. If Petitioner fails to comply with this Memorandum and Order, his appeal will not be processed. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(AOA)
|
September 16, 2013 |
Filing
21
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Petitioner Sonny D. Balvin's Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (filing no. 1 ) is dismissed with prejudice. A separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (AOA)
|
December 5, 2012 |
Filing
10
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Petitioner's Motion to Appoint Counsel (filing no. 2 ) is denied. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (AOA)
|
November 26, 2012 |
Filing
8
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Upon initial review of the Petition (filing no. 1 ), the court preliminarily decides that Petitioner's claim is potentially cognizable in federal court. The Clerk of the court is directed to mail copies of this Memorand um and Order and the Petition (filing no. 1 ) to Respondents and the Nebraska Attorney General by regular first-class mail. By January 7, 2013, Respondent shall file a motion for summary judgment or state court records in support of an answer. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: January 7, 2013: deadline for Respondent to file state court records in support of answer or motion for summary judgment. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: February 8, 2013: check for Respondent to file answer and separate brief. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party and as directed) (AOA)
|
November 2, 2012 |
Filing
7
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Petitioner's application to proceed IFP (filing no. 2 ) is denied. Petitioner is granted until November 30, 2012 to pay the $5.00 filing fee. Petitioner is warned that if the fee is not paid as required, the court may dismiss this case without further notice. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: November 30, 2012: deadline for Petitioner to pay $5.00 filing fee. No further review of this case will take place until the filing fee is paid Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (AOA)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?