Mayhue v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Reginald B. Mayhue
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administration
Case Number: 8:2012cv00407
Filed: November 27, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:0405 Review of HHS Decision
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - This matter is dismissed without prejudice because Plaintiff failed to prosecute it diligently and failed to comply with the court's orders. A separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (AOA)
May 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff shall have until May 27, 2013, to show cause why this case should not be dismissed. If Plaintiff does not respond, or if good cause is not shown, this action will be dismissed without prejudice and without further n otice. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline with the following text: May 27, 2013: deadline for Plaintiff to show cause why service of process was not completed. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(AOA)
January 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis (filing 2 ) is granted, and, accordingly, that Plaintiff shall be allowed to proceed without payment of the filing fee. The Clerk of the court shall send THREE summons for ms and THREE USM-285 forms to Plaintiff for service of process on the United States. Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m) requires service of process by no later than 120 days after the filing of a civil complaint. Upon receipt of the completed sum mons forms and USM-285 forms, the Clerk shall sign the summonses and forward them, together with copies of the complaint, to the U.S. Marshal for service on the United States. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy with forms mailed as directed)(AOA)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mayhue v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reginald B. Mayhue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administration
Represented By: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?