September 28, 2016 |
Filing
270
ORDER - The plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Joshua Keadle without Prejudice (filing 269 ) is granted pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). The plaintiff's claims against Keadle are dismissed without prejudice. The plaintiff's motion for default judgment (filing 243 ) is denied as moot. A separate judgment will be entered. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (KLF)
|
October 8, 2015 |
Filing
261
ORDER that on the Court's own motion, the telephonic status conference scheduled for October 19, 2015, is continued until May 9, 2016, at 10:30 a.m. Plaintiff's counsel will initiate the call to Judge Gerrard's chambers. A copy of this order shall be mailed to the Defendant. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed as directed)(MBM)
|
August 18, 2015 |
Filing
245
ORDER that the jury trial set to begin on August 24, 2015, is cancelled. The Clerk of the Court is directed to enter Joshua Keadle's default. A telephonic status conference is scheduled to be held before Judge Gerrard at 10:30 a.m. on October 19, 2015, regarding the progression of the plaintiff's state-court proceedings and any interlocutory appeal that the plaintiff may pursue. (Copy mailed to defendant) (MBM)
|
July 28, 2015 |
Filing
242
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The Board's Motion for Summary Judgment 181 is granted. Thomas's claims against the Board are dismissed. The Board's motion to strike and its objections to various exhibits (filing 227) are denied as moot. Thomas's motions in limine 171 , 173 and 218 , and her motion to find Keadle unavailable as a witness 230 are denied as moot. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (SLP)
|
June 5, 2015 |
Filing
221
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE that Elizabeth A. Govaerts is to pay the biennial assessment. On or before July 6, 2015, attorney Elizabeth A. Govaerts shall pay the assessment or show cause by written affidavit why she cannot comply with the rules of the court. Failure to comply with this order will result in the court removing Elizabeth A. Govaerts as counsel of record in this case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (KMG)
|
May 27, 2014 |
Filing
142
ORDER granting 140 Motion to Strike. Notice of Serving Discovery Documents 137 , was filed by mistake in the pending federal court action and will be stricken. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
|
November 19, 2013 |
Filing
106
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Submit Evidence (filing 86 ) is granted. The Board's Motion to Enlarge (filing 100 ) is granted in part. Following the resolution of plaintiff's Amended Motion to Add a Party (filing 97 ), the Board shall have 21 days to file any reply brief in support of its motion to dismiss / motion for summary judgment. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (TCL )
|
June 11, 2013 |
Filing
75
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: The motion to withdraw filed by Ryan C. Gilbride as counsel of record on behalf of Defendant State of Nebraska, (filing no. 73 ), is granted. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (TCL )
|
June 6, 2013 |
Filing
74
ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss (filing 70 ) is granted. The case is dismissed against the following defendants without prejudice: Peru State College and Nebraska State College Board Members. The case is dismissed again st the following defendants with prejudice: the City of Auburn, the City of Peru, the State of Nebraska, the University of Nebraska, the Board of Regents of the University of Nebraska, and Nemaha County. Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint (filing 71 ) is granted. Plaintiff shall file any amended complaint on or before June 19, 2013. Plaintiff's previous Motion to Amend (filing 60 ) is denied as moot. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (TCL )
|
May 24, 2013 |
Filing
63
ORDER granting 61 Motion to Strike; striking 59 Motion to Amend. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
|
April 3, 2013 |
Filing
37
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: The plaintiff's motion for an additional 30 days to serve Defendant Joshua Keadle, (Filing No. 32 ), is granted. The plaintiff shall serve defendant Keadle on or before May 6, 2013. The plaintiff' s motion, (Filing No. 36 ), is granted. The Clerk of Court shall send a copy of this Memorandum and Order together with a summons form and a USM-285 form to Plaintiff's attorney of record for service of process on defendant Keadle. Plaintiff s counsel shall, as soon as possible, complete the USM-285 form and the summons form and return them to the Clerk of the court. The Clerk of the court will sign the summons form, to be forwarded with a copy of Plaintiff's Complaint to the U. S. Marshal for service of process. The Clerk of the court will copy the Complaint; Plaintiff's counsel need not to do so. The Marshal shall serve the summons and the Complaint without payment of costs or fees. This order is entered without p rejudice to the court later entering an order taxing costs in this case. No one, including any plaintiff, is relieved by this order from the obligation to pay or to reimburse taxable costs after this action is over. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Copy mailed as directed with forms)(TCL )
|
January 31, 2013 |
Filing
5
ORDER granting 4 Motion to Amend and request for service of summons by Marshal. Amended Complaint due by 2/7/2013. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
|
December 3, 2012 |
Filing
3
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: Plaintiff's application, (filing no. 2 ) is granted, and the complaint shall be filed without payment of fees. This order is entered without prejudice to the court later entering an order taxing costs in this case. No one, including any plaintiff, is relieved by this order from the obligation to pay or to reimburse taxable costs after this action is over. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (TCL )
|