Amon, Jr. v. Union Pacific Distribution Services Company
Plaintiff: Richard W. Amon, Jr.
Defendant: Union Pacific Distribution Services Company
Case Number: 8:2012cv00437
Filed: December 20, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: F.A. Gossett
Nature of Suit: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601 Family Medical Leave Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion to Restrict Access (Filing 60 ) to the evidence and pleadings Plaintiff filed in support of Plaintiff's Brief in Opposition of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment in order to prevent d isclosure of Plaintiff's confidential medical records is granted. Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (Filing 45 ) is granted as to all of Plaintiff's claims. Judgment shall be entered by separate document. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (GJG)
February 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting 67 Motion to Extend. The pretrial conference and jury trial are continued pending further order of the court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
September 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Plaintiff's Opposition Brief Deadline (Filing 51 ) is granted. The deadlines for the filing of Plaintiff's opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (Filing 45 ) and Defendant's reply thereto are suspended until such time as the Magistrate Judge rules on Plaintiff's Motion to Compel (Filing 49 ). Immediately after the Magistrate Judge rules on Plaintiff's Motion to Compel (Filing 49 ), Pl aintiff's counsel shall file a motion to set deadlines for the Plaintiff to file a brief and evidence in opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (Filing 45 ) and Defendant's reply thereto; Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (Filing 45 ) is held in abeyance until further order of the court. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Zwart to determine whether the pretrial conference and trial in this matter should be continued. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (GJG)
July 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The parties' joint motion, (Filing No. 43 ), is granted, and a. The summary judgment deadline is extended to August 22, 2014. b. The Daubert motion deadline is extended to September 26, 2014. The Pretrial Conference is sc heduled to be held before the undersigned magistrate judge on November 25, 2014 at 1:00 p.m., and will be conducted by WebEx Conferencing. An email will be sent to counsel of record with the instructions and codes for participating in the pretrial co nference by WebEx. The parties' proposed Pretrial Conference Order and Exhibit List(s) must be emailed to zwart@ned.uscourts.gov, in either Word Perfect or Word format, by 5:00 p.m. on November 24, 2014. The jury trial of this case is set t o commence before Richard G. Kopf, Senior United States District Judge, in the Special Proceedings Courtroom, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, Nebraska, at 9:00 a.m. on December 8, 2014 or as soon thereafter as the cas e may be called, for a duration of four (4) trial days. This case is subject to the prior trial of criminal cases and such other civil cases as may be scheduled for trial before this one. Jury selection will be held at the commencement of trial. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (GJG)
January 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting 35 Motion to Amend Second Amended Progression Order. Deposition deadline is 6/27/2014. Telephonic status conference is set for 7/29/2014 at 1:00 p.m. Plaintiff's counsel will place the call. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (DMS)
October 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting 28 Motion to Continue Progression Order dates. Telephone Conference reset for 1/14/2014 at 10:30 AM to discuss the status of case progression, potential settlement, and the trial and pretrial conference scheduling before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Counsel for plaintiff shall place the call. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (DMS)
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 18 Motion to Continue. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (AOA) Modified on 6/5/2013 to changed file date (AOA).
June 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PROTECTIVE ORDER granting 17 Motion for Protective Order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (AOA)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amon, Jr. v. Union Pacific Distribution Services Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard W. Amon, Jr.
Represented By: Jennifer L. Turco Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Distribution Services Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?