Schuldt Chiropractic Wellness Center v. Sebelius

Plaintiff: Schuldt Chiropractic Wellness Center
Defendant: Kathleen Sebelius
Case Number: 8:2013cv00004
Filed: January 4, 2013
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Referring Judge: F.A. Gossett
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42:1395 HHS: Adverse Reimbursement Review
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 22, 2014 46 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER- The Motion for Summary Judgment submitted by Plaintiff Schuldt Chiropractic Wellness Center ("Schuldt") (Filing No. 38 ), is denied; The Motion for Summary Judgment submitted by Defendant Kathleen Sebelius, in her c apacity as Secretary of the U.S. Department of Health and Human Services ("HHS") (Filing No. 36 ), is granted; The Plaintiff's Complaint (Filing No. 1 ) is dismissed, with prejudice; and A separate Judgment will be entered. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (MKR)
September 13, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 29 Motion to Extend. Motions for summary judgment shall be filed by October 30, 2013. Briefs responsive to any motion for summary judgment shall be submitted no later than November 22, 2013. Reply briefs shall be submitted no later than December 9, 2013. Discovery in this case remains stayed. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (ADB)
July 12, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 26 Motion to Extend. Motions for summary judgment shall be filed by September 16, 2013. Briefs responsive to any motion for summary judgment shall be submitted no later than October 16, 2013. Reply briefs shall be submitted no later than October 30, 2013. Discovery in this case remains stayed. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (ADB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schuldt Chiropractic Wellness Center v. Sebelius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Sebelius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Schuldt Chiropractic Wellness Center
Represented By: John P. Weis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?